17.04.2015 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
25.09.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] |
28.08.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] |
24.07.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] |
26.06.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] |
06.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] |
29.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] |
06.06.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] |
25.04.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2008 [2008/22] |
29.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2008 [2008/14] |
08.02.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] |
08.02.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] |
25.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2008 [2008/09] |
18.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2008 [2008/08] |
09.11.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] |
02.11.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2007 [2007/49] |
19.10.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2007 [2007/47] |
02.03.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] |
13.02.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
13.02.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.11.2006 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] |
14.10.2006 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
23.09.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.05.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.06.2006 [2006/23] |
10.02.2006 |
Publication of search report |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
11.03.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.04.2005 [2005/17] |