EP1580822 - Organic field-effect-transistor and method for its production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 17113, 1, Samsung-ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2015/40] |
Former [2012/39] | For all designated states Samsung Display Co., Ltd. 95, Samsung 2 Ro Giheung-Gu Yongin-City, Gyeonggi-Do, 446-711 / KR | ||
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Samsung Mobile Display Co., Ltd. 575 Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
Former [2005/39] | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 575, Shin-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Redecker, Michael Uhlandstr. 83a 12305 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Fischer, Joerg Dietrichstr. 4 13053 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Mathea, Arthur Schlangenbader Str. 24d 14197 Berlin / DE | [2005/39] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2014/19] |
Former [2008/43] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwälte Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2005/39] | Hengelhaupt, Jürgen, et al Anwaltskanzlei Gulde Hengelhaupt Ziebig & Schneider Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 04090119.1 | 24.03.2004 | [2005/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1580822 | Date: | 28.09.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/20 | [2005/39] | CPC: |
H10K10/464 (EP,KR);
H10K10/472 (US);
H10K10/466 (EP,KR);
H10K10/471 (US);
H10K85/113 (EP,KR);
H10K85/114 (EP,KR);
H10K85/115 (EP,KR);
H10K85/151 (EP,KR);
H10K85/621 (EP,KR);
H01L21/02197 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/39] | Title | German: | Organischer Feldeffekttransistor und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung | [2005/39] | English: | Organic field-effect-transistor and method for its production | [2005/39] | French: | Transistor à effet de champ et methode de sa production | [2005/39] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/39] | 20.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.03.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/36] | 20.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.01.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2017 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6207472 (CALLEGARI ALESSANDRO CESARE [US], et al); | [X]US6232157 (DODABALAPUR ANANTH [US], et al); | [A]US2002195644 (DODABALAPUR ANANTH [US], et al); | [X]WO03028125 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]); | [X]EP1398840 (PIONEER CORP [JP]); | Examination | US4408563 | EP0716459 | EP0962260 | JP2004063978 | EP1394873 | by applicant | EP1398840 |