EP1542416 - Equalizer and method of setting initial value for same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/24] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimobayashi, Shinya c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-01 / JP | 02 /
Matsumoto, Mariko c/o NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-01 / JP | [2005/24] | Representative(s) | Stork Bamberger Patentanwälte PartmbB Meiendorfer Strasse 89 22145 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/07] | Stork Bamberger Patentanwälte Postfach 73 04 66 22124 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2005/24] | Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff Grubesallee 26 22143 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 04090485.6 | 10.12.2004 | [2005/24] | Priority number, date | JP20030411701 | 10.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003411701 | [2005/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1542416 | Date: | 15.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1542416 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | [2006/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/03 | [2005/24] | CPC: |
H04L25/03038 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03477 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03605 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03656 (EP,US);
H04L25/0226 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/22] |
Former [2005/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Entzerrer und Verfahren zum Setzen eines Startwertes für den Entzerrer | [2005/24] | English: | Equalizer and method of setting initial value for same | [2005/24] | French: | Egalisateur et procédé de mise d'une valeur initiale pour l'égalisateur | [2005/24] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2006 | Examination requested [2006/49] | 05.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/52] | 10.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/52] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.05.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5517524 (SATO TERUO [JP]) [X] 1-9 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 54 * * column 3, line 19 - line 57 * * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [X]WO0059168 (UNIV BRISTOL [GB], et al) [X] 1,7-9 * page 5, line 4 - line 17 * * page 7, line 15 - line 20 * * page 8, line 13 - line 14 * * claims 1,2 *; | [A] - HAYKIN S, "Adaptive Filter Theory, PASSAGE", ADAPTIVE FILTER THEORY, (1996), pages 432 - 437, XP002251177 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | Examination | EP0825727 | GB2333013 | by applicant | US5517524 | WO0059168 | - Base and Application of Signal Processing, NISSHIN SHUPPAN CO. |