Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
23.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] |
10.08.2012 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
23.02.2012 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
13.01.2012 | Change - representative | published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] |
12.01.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.01.2011 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
05.01.2010 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
07.10.2008 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
04.09.2008 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
02.05.2008 | First examination report | |
30.04.2008 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
09.04.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.01.2008 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.04.2007 | Definitive list of designations | published on 30.05.2007 [2007/22] |
10.01.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.11.2006 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] |
25.08.2006 | Publication of search report | published on 27.09.2006 [2006/39] |
29.04.2005 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.06.2005 [2005/24] |