Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7406122 | Global Dossier | 29.07.2008 | B2 | US2005129106 | 16.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2003411701 | 10.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4457657B | Global Dossier | 28.04.2010 | B2 | JP2005175775 | 30.06.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003411701 | 10.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1542416 | Global Dossier | 27.09.2006 | A3 | EP1542416 | 15.06.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2003411701 | 10.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1627739 | 15.06.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2003411701 | 10.12.2003 |