EP1455304 - Method and apparatus for segmentation of compound documents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2009 [2009/33] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
LI
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/37] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
LI
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IT
LU
MC
NL
PT
RO
SE
SI
SK
TR
SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guleryuz, Onur G. 1260 Ayala Drive, 210 Sunnyvale, CA California 94086 / US | [2007/32] |
Former [2004/37] | 01 /
Guleryuz, Onur G. 1260 Ayala Drive, #210 Sunnyvale, CA California 94086 / US | Representative(s) | Brunner, Michael John, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/37] | Brunner, Michael John, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 04100860.8 | 03.03.2004 | [2004/37] | Priority number, date | US20030453077 | 06.03.2003 Original published format: US 453077 | US20030625107 | 23.07.2003 Original published format: US 625107 | [2004/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1455304 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1455304 | Date: | 10.01.2007 | [2007/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, H04N1/00, H04N1/40 | [2006/43] | CPC: |
H04N1/40062 (EP,US);
G06T5/20 (EP,US);
G06T5/75 (EP,US);
G06T7/12 (EP,US);
G06V30/413 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10008 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30176 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2004/37] | G06T7/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/37] |
Former [2004/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Segmentierung von zusammengesetzten Dokumenten | [2004/37] | English: | Method and apparatus for segmentation of compound documents | [2004/37] | French: | Procédé et appareil de segmentation de documents composés | [2004/37] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/34] | 11.07.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 07.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.02.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/33] | 26.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4194221 (STOFFEL JAMES C [US]) [Y] 7,40,41 * figures 2,3,11 * * column 1, line 10 - line 54 * * column 2, line 26 - column 4, line 45 * * column 5, line 9 - column 6, line 34 * * column 7, line 32 - column 8, line 4 * * column 8, line 54 - column 10, line 10 *; | [XY]US5392365 (STEINKIRCHNER JAMES J [US]) [X] 8,11,20,22,35-39 * figures 1,2,5,10 * * column 2, line 50 - column 6, line 15 * [Y] 18,40,41; | [XY] - TABBONE S ET AL, "Efficient edge detection using two scales", COMPUTER VISION AND PATTERN RECOGNITION, 1993. PROCEEDINGS CVPR '93., 1993 IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY CONFERENCE ON NEW YORK, NY, USA 15-17 JUNE 1993, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, (19930615), ISBN 0-8186-3880-X, pages 789 - 790, XP010096003 [X] 1,2,4,16,17 * page 789, column L, paragraph 1 * * page 790, column L, paragraph 3 - column R * * figure 1 * [Y] 6,7,18,19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/CVPR.1993.341177 | [XY] - CHANG-JOON PARK, JOON-HYUNG JEON, TAK-MO KOO, HEUNG-MOON CHOI, "An edge-based block segmentation and classification for document analysis with automatic character string extraction", SYSTEMS, MAN, AND CYBERNETICS, 1996, IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SYSTEMS, MAN, AND CYBERNETICS, 1996, (19961114), vol. 1, pages 707 - 712, XP002399152 [X] 8,9,12,13,20,23 * page 708, column L, paragraph 2.1 - page 710, column L, paragraph 2.3 * * figures 2,3 * [Y] 6,19 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICSMC.1996.569881 | [X] - SATOSHI OHUCHI ET AL, "A SEGMENTATION METHOD FOR COMPOSITE TEXT/GRAPHICS (HALFTONE AND CONTINUOUS TONE PHOTOGRAPHS) DOCUMENTS", SYSTEMS & COMPUTERS IN JAPAN, WILEY, HOBOKEN, NJ, US, (199301), vol. 24, no. 2, ISSN 0882-1666, pages 35 - 44, XP000417662 [X] 8,9,12,13,20,23 * page 35, column R, paragraph 1 - page 37, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 37, column R, paragraph 4.1 - page 40, column L, paragraph 4.2 * * page 40, paragraph 5 - page 42 * * figures 1,2,4,6,10,14,16 * | [X] - LI M ET AL, "PYRAMID EDGE DETECTION FOR COLOR IMAGES", OPTICAL ENGINEERING, SOC. OF PHOTO-OPTICAL INSTRUMENTATION ENGINEERS. BELLINGHAM, US, (199705), vol. 36, no. 5, ISSN 0091-3286, pages 1431 - 1437, XP000692376 [X] 1,2,4,16,17 * page 1431, column L, paragraph 1 - column R * * page 1434, column R, paragraph 4 - page 1435, column L * * figures 2,9-11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/1.601372 |