EP1538118 - Device for the floating transport of articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 15.12.2010 [2010/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COLENTA Labortechnik Ges.m.b.H. & Co. KG. Neunkirchner Str. 117 2700 Wiener Neustadt / AT | [2005/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hauser, Hans Bachgasse 3 1160 Wien / AT | 02 /
Fulmek, Paul Valenting. 1A 1230 Wien / AT | [2008/30] |
Former [2005/23] | 01 /
Hauser, Hans Dr. Bachgasse 3 1160 Wien / AT | ||
02 /
Fulmek, Paul Dr. Valenting. 1A 1230 Wien / AT | Representative(s) | Müllner, Martin, et al Patentanwälte Martin Müllner, Markus Speringer Postfach 169 Weihburggasse 9 1010 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | Müllner, Martin, et al Patentanwalt Weihburggasse 9, Postfach 159 1014 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2005/23] | Müllner, Erwin, Dr., et al Weihburggasse 9 Postfach 159 1014 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 04106299.3 | 04.12.2004 | [2005/23] | Priority number, date | AT20030001956 | 05.12.2003 Original published format: AT 19562003 | AT20040001679 | 08.10.2004 Original published format: AT 16792004 | [2005/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1538118 | Date: | 08.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1538118 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | [2006/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1538118 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65G54/02, B60L13/04 | [2005/23] | CPC: |
B65G54/02 (EP);
B60L13/04 (EP);
B60L2200/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/23] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum schwebenden Transport von Gegenständen | [2005/23] | English: | Device for the floating transport of articles | [2005/23] | French: | Dispositif pour le transport par flottage d'articles | [2005/23] | Examination procedure | 03.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/33] | 06.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.07.2008 | CZ | 23.07.2008 | DK | 23.07.2008 | EE | 23.07.2008 | FI | 23.07.2008 | IE | 23.07.2008 | LT | 23.07.2008 | NL | 23.07.2008 | PL | 23.07.2008 | RO | 23.07.2008 | SI | 23.07.2008 | SK | 23.07.2008 | TR | 23.07.2008 | BG | 23.10.2008 | SE | 23.10.2008 | GR | 24.10.2008 | IS | 23.11.2008 | LU | 04.12.2008 | PT | 23.12.2008 | BE | 31.12.2008 | CH | 31.12.2008 | LI | 31.12.2008 | MC | 31.12.2008 | HU | 24.01.2009 | [2010/50] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 23.07.2008 | |
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
PL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
TR | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
LU | 04.12.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
HU | 24.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/34] | CY | 23.07.2008 | |
CZ | 23.07.2008 | ||
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
PL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
LU | 04.12.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
HU | 24.01.2009 | ||
Former [2010/32] | CZ | 23.07.2008 | |
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
PL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
LU | 04.12.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/24] | CZ | 23.07.2008 | |
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
PL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2010/09] | CZ | 23.07.2008 | |
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
SE | 23.10.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/47] | CZ | 23.07.2008 | |
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
CH | 31.12.2008 | ||
LI | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/44] | CZ | 23.07.2008 | |
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
BE | 31.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CZ | 23.07.2008 | |
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
MC | 31.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | CZ | 23.07.2008 | |
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
RO | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 23.07.2008 | |
DK | 23.07.2008 | ||
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
SK | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/23] | DK | 23.07.2008 | |
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
IE | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | DK | 23.07.2008 | |
EE | 23.07.2008 | ||
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/20] | DK | 23.07.2008 | |
FI | 23.07.2008 | ||
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | FI | 23.07.2008 | |
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
SI | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | FI | 23.07.2008 | |
LT | 23.07.2008 | ||
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
BG | 23.10.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/09] | LT | 23.07.2008 | |
NL | 23.07.2008 | ||
IS | 23.11.2008 | ||
PT | 23.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0356370 (SCHUSTER PETER [DE]) [A] 3* the whole document *; | [XA]DE19501571 (WIMMER ULRICH DIPL ING FH [DE]) [X] 3 * column 3, line 19 - line 25; figure 1 * [A] 4; | [X]DE19629033 (WIMMER ULRICH DIPL ING FH [DE]) [X] 3 * figure 1 *; | [A]US2003005851 (POST RICHARD FREEMAN [US]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0037]; figure 1 *; | [A] - MILLER D L, "FRICTIONLESS BEARING SUPPORT FOR VACUUM TRANSPORT", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19770108), vol. 19, no. 8, ISSN 0018-8689, page 2839, XP002149027 [A] 1 * the whole document * |