EP1455408 - Method for preparing membrane electrode assemblies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arkema Inc. 2000 Market Street Philadelphia, PA 19103-3222 / US | [2005/15] |
Former [2004/37] | For all designated states Atofina Chemicals, Inc. 2000 Market Street Philadelphia, PA 19103-3222 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Culp, Thomas Dudley 531 Fairfax Road Drexel Hill, Pennsylvania 19026 / US | 02 /
Hedhli, Lotfi 53 Llanfair Road Ardmore, Pennsylvania 19003 / US | 03 /
Silverman, Gary Stephen 19 Grouse Trail Chadds Ford, Pennsylvania 19317 / US | 04 /
Tro Adjemian, Kevork 3000 Valley Forge Circle No. 1548 King of Prussia, Pennsylvania 19406 / US | [2004/37] | Representative(s) | Lhoste, Catherine, et al ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/29] | Lhoste, Catherine, et al ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 420 Rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2006/51] | Lhoste, Catherine, et al ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8 cours Michelet La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense / FR | ||
Former [2006/46] | Lhoste, Catherine, et al ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8 cours Michelet La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense / FR | ||
Former [2004/37] | Treuil, Claude Atofina Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8 cours Michelet La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04290604.0 | 05.03.2004 | [2004/37] | Priority number, date | US20030452324P | 06.03.2003 Original published format: US 452324 P | US20040773822 | 06.02.2004 Original published format: US 773822 | [2004/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1455408 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1455408 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/10, H01M4/88 | [2004/37] | CPC: |
C23C16/45593 (EP,US);
C23C16/18 (EP,US);
C23C16/45595 (EP,US);
C23C16/505 (EP,US);
H01M4/8605 (EP,US);
H01M4/8867 (EP,US);
H01M4/926 (EP,US);
H01M8/1004 (EP,US);
H01M8/1023 (EP,US);
H01M8/1039 (EP,US);
H01M4/921 (EP,US);
H01M8/1009 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2004/37] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Elektrodenmembrananordnung (MEA) | [2004/37] | English: | Method for preparing membrane electrode assemblies | [2004/37] | French: | Procédé pour la production d'un ensemble électrode-membrane (MEA) | [2004/37] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/37] | 30.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.2006 | CH | 21.06.2006 | CY | 21.06.2006 | CZ | 21.06.2006 | EE | 21.06.2006 | FI | 21.06.2006 | IT | 21.06.2006 | LI | 21.06.2006 | PL | 21.06.2006 | RO | 21.06.2006 | SI | 21.06.2006 | SK | 21.06.2006 | TR | 21.06.2006 | BG | 21.09.2006 | DK | 21.09.2006 | GR | 22.09.2006 | PT | 21.11.2006 | HU | 22.12.2006 | IE | 05.03.2007 | LU | 05.03.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/40] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CY | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
IE | 05.03.2007 | ||
LU | 05.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/38] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
EE | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
IE | 05.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
BG | 21.09.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
IE | 05.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
GR | 22.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
IE | 05.03.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
IE | 05.03.2007 | ||
Former [2007/43] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
IT | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
RO | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
DK | 21.09.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/15] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
PL | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SK | 21.06.2006 | ||
PT | 21.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/03] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
CH | 21.06.2006 | ||
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
LI | 21.06.2006 | ||
SI | 21.06.2006 | ||
Former [2007/01] | AT | 21.06.2006 | |
FI | 21.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 21.06.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5750013 (LIN ANDREW S [TW]) [A] * abstract ** column 5, line 18 - line 59 *; | [X]US2002058143 (HUNT ANDREW T [US], et al) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] , [0015] , [0053] - [0055] - [0073] *; | [A]US6403245 (HUNT ANDREW T [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * abstract * |