EP1581567 - GROUP III BRIDGED METALLOCENE BASED ON CYCLOPENTADIENYL-FLUORENYL LIGANDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.02.2011 [2011/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RESEARCH FELUY Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE -CNRS- 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | For all designated states TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RESEARCH FELUY Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | ||
For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARPENTIER, Jean-François 5, allée des Lilas F-35690 Acigne / FR | 02 /
KIRILLOV, Evgueni UMR 6226 Université de Rennes 1 35042 Rennes / FR | 03 /
RAZAVI, Abbas 35, Domaine de la Brisée B-7000 Mons / BE | [2007/26] |
Former [2005/40] | 01 /
CARPENTIER, Jean-François 5, allée des Lilas F-35690 Acigne / FR | ||
02 /
KIRILLOV, Evgueni Institut für Organische Chemie, 42, Henkestrasse 91054 Erlangen / DE | |||
03 /
RAZAVI, Abbas 35, Domaine de la Brisée B-7000 Mons / BE | Representative(s) | Leyder, Francis Total Research & Technology Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/40] | Leyder, Francis Total Petrochemicals Research Feluy Zone Industrielle C 7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE | Application number, filing date | 04700260.5 | 06.01.2004 | [2005/40] | WO2004EP00142 | Priority number, date | FR20030000086 | 07.01.2003 Original published format: FR 0300086 | [2005/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004060942 | Date: | 22.07.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1581567 | Date: | 05.10.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.07.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.11.2004 | Classification | IPC: | C08F112/08, C08F4/52, C07F17/00, C08F120/06 | [2005/40] | CPC: |
C08F4/52 (EP,KR,US);
C07F17/00 (EP,US);
C08F10/00 (EP,US);
C08F112/08 (KR);
C08F120/06 (KR);
Y10S526/943 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F10/00, C08F4/52 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBRÜCKTES GRUPPE 3-METALLOCEN BASIERT AUF CYCLOPENTADIENYL-FLUORENYL LIGANDEN | [2005/40] | English: | GROUP III BRIDGED METALLOCENE BASED ON CYCLOPENTADIENYL-FLUORENYL LIGANDS | [2005/40] | French: | METALLOCENE PONTE CONTENANT UN METAL DU GROUPE III ET A BASE DE LIGANDS CYCLOPENTADIENYLE ET FLUORENYLE | [2005/40] | Entry into regional phase | 06.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 06.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.2005 | Examination requested [2005/40] | 28.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/06] | 10.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]JPH07258319 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) [DX] 1-14* paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0040]; claim 1 *; | [X] - YASUDA, HAJIME ET AL, "Organometallic catalysts containing cyclopentadienyl group-containing fluorene derivatives and their use for polymerization of vinyl monomers", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 124:88161, URL: STN, XP002257535 [X] 1-14 * abstract * |