|
11.10.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2010 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.07.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.07.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.03.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
23.09.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.09.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.10.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.10.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.10.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.2006 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2006 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.06.2006 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.04.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.04.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.01.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.12.2005 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
24.12.2005 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.12.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2005 |
Communication in cases for which no other form is applicable |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2005 |
Notification of submission or transmittal of priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.2005 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
12.10.2005 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.09.2005 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.09.2005 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.09.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.09.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.09.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.09.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
19.09.2005 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
19.09.2005 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
16.02.2005 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2005 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2005 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
25.01.2005 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
10.01.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
23.12.2004 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2004 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
21.12.2004 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
21.12.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.12.2004 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
17.12.2004 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
17.12.2004 |
Submission concerning representation |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
05.07.2004 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
05.07.2004 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
05.07.2004 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
19 |