19.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
21.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
08.04.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] |
02.07.2010 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 04.08.2010 [2010/31] |
11.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] |
14.05.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.06.2010 [2010/24] |
07.05.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] |
30.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] |
16.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] |
02.04.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.05.2010 [2010/18] |
26.03.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] |
19.03.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] |
12.02.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.03.2010 [2010/11] |
29.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.03.2010 [2010/09] |
24.07.2009 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.08.2009 [2009/35] |
15.07.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.07.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.06.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.02.2009 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.09.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
24.05.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.04.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.05.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.11.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.08.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.06.2006 |
Change - representative |
published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] |
01.04.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.04.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.03.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 17.05.2006 [2006/20] |
27.01.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.03.2006 [2006/11] |
27.01.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.03.2006 [2006/11] |
17.01.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.01.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.10.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.02.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.01.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.10.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.07.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|