|
19.06.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the postal address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2012 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2011 |
Confirmation of the correction of a decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.10.2011 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2011 |
Request for correction of the publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2011 |
Request for correction of the publication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.09.2011 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2011 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.09.2011 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2011 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2011 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.09.2011 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
01.09.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.09.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.08.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
12.02.2007 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
16.01.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.2007 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2006 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2006 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.09.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.09.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
19.12.2005 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.11.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.10.2005 |
Annex to International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
11.10.2005 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.10.2005 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.10.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
11.10.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
11.10.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
11.10.2005 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
11.10.2005 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
11.10.2005 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.04.2005 |
Amendments of documents (Article 19 PCT) |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
06.04.2005 |
Claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
06.04.2005 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
14.03.2005 |
Notification of defects in the demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
09.02.2005 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.01.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
07.01.2005 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.01.2005 |
Letter regarding PCTII procedure |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
07.01.2005 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
07.01.2005 |
PCT(IPEA): Amended sheet - claims |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
06.01.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.01.2005 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
40 |
|
20.07.2004 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
20.07.2004 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
20.07.2004 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
35 |