30.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
12.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] |
18.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.02.2013 [2013/08] |
17.08.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] |
27.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
08.06.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2012 [2012/28] |
18.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2012 [2012/25] |
11.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2012 [2012/24] |
04.05.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2012 [2012/23] |
09.09.2011 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] |
08.09.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
08.09.2011 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
01.07.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.04.2011 |
Change: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.03.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
30.06.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.07.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.08.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
08.07.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.07.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.02.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.07.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.02.2007 |
Change - inventor |
published on 28.03.2007 [2007/13] |
16.02.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.01.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.01.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.01.2007 |
First examination report |
|
01.09.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] |
07.07.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.03.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.05.2006 [2006/18] |
17.03.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.05.2006 [2006/18] |
03.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.03.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.02.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.02.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.01.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|