Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7641788 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2010 | B2 | US2006175231 | 10.08.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DKPA200300960 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004EP06376 | 14.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007506809 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | DKPA200300960 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004EP06376 | 14.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1651738 | Global Dossier | 12.10.2011 | B1 | EP1651738 | 03.05.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DKPA200300960 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004EP06376 | 14.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE528378T | 15.10.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DKPA200300960 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004EP06376 | 14.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2374291T | 15.02.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DKPA200300960 | 26.06.2003 | WO2004EP06376 | 14.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1651738T | 30.03.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DKPA200300960 | 26.06.2003 | EP04739859 | 14.06.2004 | WO2004EP06376 | 14.06.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005001000 | Global Dossier | 06.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DKPA200300960 | 26.06.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20060023175 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | DKPA200300960 | 26.06.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1839195 | 27.09.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | DKPA200300960 | 26.06.2003 |