EP1651738 - HYDROCARBON CONVERSION PROCESS AND CATALYST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HALDOR TOPSO̸E A/S Nymo̸llevej 55 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2006/18] | For all designated states HALDOR TOPSOE A/S Nym llevej 55 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSEN, Jens, A. Sollerodvej 90A DK-2840 Holte / DK | 02 /
BLOM, Niels Jorgen Brunebjerg 24 Tulstrup DK-3400 Hillerod / DK | 03 /
BYBERG, Birgitte, R. Fuglesangsvej 13 DK-3460 Birkerod / DK | 04 /
WARD, John, W. 19002 Gordon Lane Yorba Linda, CA 92686-4214 / US | [2011/41] |
Former [2006/18] | 01 /
HANSEN, Jens, A. Sollerodvej 90A DK-2840 Holte / DK | ||
02 /
BLOM, Niels Jorgen Brunebjerg 24, Tulstrup DK-3400 Hillerod / DK | |||
03 /
BYBERG, Birgitte, R. Fuglesangsvej 13 DK-3400 Hillerod / DK | |||
04 /
WARD, John, W. 19002 Gordon Lane Yorba Linda, CA 92686-4214 / US | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/41] | Application number, filing date | 04739859.9 | 14.06.2004 | [2006/18] | WO2004EP06376 | Priority number, date | DK20030000960 | 26.06.2003 Original published format: DK 200300960 | [2006/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005001000 | Date: | 06.01.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1651738 | Date: | 03.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.01.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1651738 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.01.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C10G47/16, C10G47/20 | [2006/18] | CPC: |
C10G47/16 (EP,KR,US);
C10G47/20 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/18] | Title | German: | KOHLENWASSERSTOFFUMWANDLUNGSVERFAHREN UND KATALYSATOR | [2006/18] | English: | HYDROCARBON CONVERSION PROCESS AND CATALYST | [2006/18] | French: | PROCESSUS DE TRANSFORMATION D'HYDROCARBURE ET CATALYSEUR | [2006/18] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.01.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/18] | 06.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.09.2006 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.10.2011 | DK | 12.10.2011 | EE | 12.10.2011 | SI | 12.10.2011 | BG | 12.01.2012 | GR | 13.01.2012 | PT | 13.02.2012 | IE | 14.06.2012 | LU | 14.06.2012 | CH | 30.06.2012 | LI | 30.06.2012 | MC | 30.06.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2013/20] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
IE | 14.06.2012 | ||
CH | 30.06.2012 | ||
LI | 30.06.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
MC | 30.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
DK | 12.10.2011 | ||
EE | 12.10.2011 | ||
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
BG | 12.01.2012 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 12.10.2011 | |
SI | 12.10.2011 | ||
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | SI | 12.10.2011 | |
GR | 13.01.2012 | ||
PT | 13.02.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | GR | 13.01.2012 | |
PT | 13.02.2012 | Cited in | International search | [DX]US5350501 (WARD JOHN J [US]) [DX] 1-11 * column 4, line 3 - column 7, line 37 ** column 14, line 15 - line 24; claims 1,9; table 1 *; | [X]WO9720016 (SHELL INT RESEARCH [NL], et al) [X] 1-11 * page 6, line 34 - page 12, line 15; claims 1,3,8-10 *; | [X]US2002094931 (WANG FENGLAI [CN], et al) [X] 1-11 * columns 1,29; table 6 * |