EP1633013 - LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2012 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 5-5, Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-shi, Osaka-fu 570-8677 / JP | [2006/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JITO, Daizo 6-1-29-508, Shimosawadori Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6520047 / JP | 02 /
TAMURA, Noriyuki 3-5-21-202, Goinoike-cho Nagata-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6530851 / JP | 03 /
SAKITANI, Nobuhiro 2-4-2-206, Zenkaiminamimachi Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512109 / JP | 04 /
MINAMI, Hiroshi 5-3-4-407, Kashinodai, Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2275 / JP | 05 /
YAGI, Hiromasa 11-36-303, Hirota-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 6620837 / JP | 06 /
KAMINO, Maruo 2-12-15-608, Zenkaiminami-machi, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2109 / JP | 07 /
SAYAMA, Katsunobu 2-12-15-605, Zenkaiminamimachi Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512109 / JP | 08 /
KATO, Yoshio 2-12-15-501, Zenkaiminamimachi Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512109 / JP | 09 /
MATSUTA, Shigeki 1-18-14, Kashinodai Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512275 / JP | [2011/40] |
Former [2011/24] | 01 /
ITO, Daizo 6-1-29-508, Shimosawadori Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6520047 / JP | ||
02 /
TAMURA, Noriyuki 3-5-21-202, Goinoike-cho Nagata-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6530851 / JP | |||
03 /
SAKITANI, Nobuhiro 2-4-2-206, Zenkaiminamimachi Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512109 / JP | |||
04 /
MINAMI, Hiroshi 5-3-4-407, Kashinodai, Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2275 / JP | |||
05 /
YAGI, Hiromasa 11-36-303, Hirota-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 6620837 / JP | |||
06 /
KAMINO, Maruo 2-12-15-608, Zenkaiminami-machi, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2109 / JP | |||
07 /
SAYAMA, Katsunobu 2-12-15-605, Zenkaiminamimachi Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512109 / JP | |||
08 /
KATO, Yoshio 2-12-15-501, Zenkaiminamimachi Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512109 / JP | |||
09 /
MATSUTA, Shigeki 1-18-14, Kashinodai Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512275 / JP | |||
Former [2008/01] | 01 /
JITO, Daizo 6-1-29-508, Shimosawadori Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6520047 / JP | ||
02 /
TAMURA, Noriyuki 3-5-21-202, Goinoike-cho Nagata-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6530851 / JP | |||
03 /
SAKITANI, Nobuhiro 2-4-2-206, Zenkaiminamimachi Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512109 / JP | |||
04 /
MINAMI, Hiroshi 5-3-4-407, Kashinodai, Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-2275 / JP | |||
05 /
YAGI, Hiromasa 11-36-303, Hirota-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 6620837 / JP | |||
06 /
KAMINO, Maruo 2-12-15-608, Zenkaiminami-machi, Nishi-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-2109 / JP | |||
07 /
SAYAMA, Katsunobu 2-12-15-605, Zenkaiminamimachi Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512109 / JP | |||
08 /
KATO, Yoshio 2-12-15-501, Zenkaiminamimachi Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512109 / JP | |||
09 /
MATSUTA, Shigeki 1-18-14, Kashinodai Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512275 / JP | |||
Former [2006/10] | 01 /
JITO, Daizo 6-1-29-508, Shimosawadori Hyogo-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6520047 / JP | ||
02 /
TAMURA, Noriyuki 3-5-21-202, Goinoike-cho Nagata-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6530851 / JP | |||
03 /
SAKITANI, Nobuhiro 2-4-2-206, Zenkaiminamimachi Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512109 / JP | |||
04 /
MINAMI, Hiroshi 31-1-4003, Azayamashimo, Sasakino,Matsushige-cho Itano-gun, Tokushima 7710200 / JP | |||
05 /
YAGI, Hiromasa 11-36-303, Hirota-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo 6620837 / JP | |||
06 /
KAMINO, Maruo 31-1-3005, Azayamashimo, Sasakino, Matsushige-cho Itano-gun, Tokushima 7710200 / JP | |||
07 /
SAYAMA, Katsunobu 2-12-15-605, Zenkaiminamimachi Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512109 / JP | |||
08 /
KATO, Yoshio 2-12-15-501, Zenkaiminamimachi Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512109 / JP | |||
09 /
MATSUTA, Shigeki 1-18-14, Kashinodai Nishi-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo 6512275 / JP | Representative(s) | Merkle, Gebhard Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/41] | Merkle, Gebhard TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/10] | Merkle, Gebhard TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR, Patentanwälte, Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04745547.2 | 03.06.2004 | [2006/10] | WO2004JP07691 | Priority number, date | JP20030163692 | 09.06.2003 Original published format: JP 2003163692 | JP20030432477 | 26.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003432477 | JP20040080919 | 19.03.2004 Original published format: JP 2004080919 | JP20040132741 | 28.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004132741 | [2006/10] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2004109839 | Date: | 16.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1633013 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1633013 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.12.2004 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/052, H01M10/056, H01M4/02, H01M4/04, H01M4/38, H01M4/64, H01M4/66, H01M10/42 | [2011/41] | CPC: |
H01M10/052 (EP,US);
H01M10/05 (KR);
H01M10/0567 (EP,US);
H01M10/0568 (EP,US);
H01M10/0585 (EP,US);
H01M10/4235 (EP,US);
H01M4/134 (EP,US);
H01M4/38 (KR);
H01M4/386 (EP,US);
H01M4/40 (KR);
H01M10/0565 (EP,US);
H01M10/0569 (EP,US);
H01M2300/0017 (EP,US);
H01M4/405 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2006/10] | H01M10/40, H01M4/02, H01M4/04, H01M4/38, H01M4/64, H01M4/66 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/37] |
Former [2006/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LITHIUM-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2006/10] | English: | LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERY AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME | [2006/10] | French: | ACCUMULATEUR AU LITHIUM ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2006/10] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2005 | Translation filed | 09.05.2005 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2005 | Search fee paid | 09.05.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2005 | Examination requested [2006/10] | 27.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]WO0129913 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [DA] 5-15,22,23,26-28 * the whole document *; | [XY]US6235427 (IDOTA YOSHIO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,8-15,18,23-25 * column 1, line 47 - line 25 * * column 3, line 16 - line 34 * * column 11, line 46 - column 15, line 65 * * column 25, line 14 - line 47 * [Y] 5-7,16,17,19-22,26-28; | [Y]WO02058182 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [Y] 5-7,16,17,19-22,26-28 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2003007305 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) [A] 6,7 * EPODOC Abstract *; | [L]WO2004114453 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO [JP], et al) [L] 1-28 * the whole document *; | [L]US6887511 (SHIMA MASAKI [JP], et al) [L] 5-15,22,23,26-28 * used as translation for WO 01/29913 A; column 1, line 53 - column 2, line 11 * * column 2, line 54 - line 63 * * column 3, line 26 - column 4, line 35 * * column 5, line 5 - line 30 * * column 6, line 1 - line 62 * * column 7, line 28 - column 10, line 6 ** column 11, line 12 - line 26 *; | [L]US2005100790 (OTA TAEKO [JP], et al) [L] 5-7,16,17,19-22,26-28 * used as translation for WO02/058182 A; paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0085] *; | [T]EP1905739 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP [JP]) [T] 2 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0056] * * paragraph [0117] * * examples 5,6 * * table 2 * | International search | [A]JPH06124700 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPH06150975 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE); | [A]JPH07176323 (MITSUBISHI CABLE IND LTD); | [A]JPH07249431 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JPH0864246 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPH1040958 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [A]JP2002289177 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JP2002319431 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JP2003017040 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) | by applicant | US4853304 | JPH06124700 | JPH06150975 | JPH07176323 | JPH07249431 | JPH0864246 | JPH0963649 | JPH1040958 | WO0129913 | US6235427 | JP2001307771 | WO02058182 | WO02071512 | JP2002329502 | JP2003086243 |