18.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
30.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
12.07.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
26.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] |
12.04.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2013 [2013/20] |
11.01.2013 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] |
21.12.2012 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] |
14.12.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] |
09.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.12.2012 [2012/50] |
02.11.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] |
26.10.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] |
07.09.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] |
10.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
03.08.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
27.07.2012 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] |
13.01.2012 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] |
12.01.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
12.01.2012 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
23.08.2011 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.06.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.07.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.05.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.05.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.06.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.01.2009 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.11.2008 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.08.2008 |
First examination report |
|
26.07.2008 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.05.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.11.2007 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] |
09.11.2007 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] |
09.11.2007 |
Change - classification |
published on 12.12.2007 [2007/50] |
28.04.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.03.2007 |
Change - inventor |
published on 04.04.2007 [2007/14] |
28.07.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 30.08.2006 [2006/35] |
31.05.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.01.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.03.2006 [2006/11] |
27.01.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.03.2006 [2006/11] |
23.11.2005 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.11.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.11.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.11.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.11.2005 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
08.04.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.03.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.12.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.12.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.09.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|