EP1633695 - SMOOTH MUSCLE SPASMOLYTIC AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridge Pharma, Inc. 902 Contento Street Sarasota, FL 34242 / US | [2006/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABERG, Gunnar, A., K. 902 Contento Street Sarasota, FL 34242 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Jan, L. 3 Cox Lane Shrewsbury, MA 01545 / US | 03 /
MAIOLI, Andrew, T. 35 Druid Road Warwick, RI 02888 / US | 04 /
WRIGHT, George, E. 298 Highland Street Worcester, MA 01602 / US | [2007/14] |
Former [2006/11] | 01 /
ABERG, Gunnar, A., K. 902 Contento Street Sarasota, FL 34242 / US | ||
02 /
CHEN, Jan, L. 23 Redland Road Shrewsbury, MA 01545 / US | |||
03 /
MAIOLI, Andrew, T. 35 Druid Road Warwick, RI 02888 / US | |||
04 /
WRIGHT, George, E. 298 Highland Street Worcester, MA 01602 / US | Representative(s) | Gambell, Derek, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | Gambell, Derek, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04753088.6 | 21.05.2004 | [2006/11] | WO2004US16199 | Priority number, date | US20030473173P | 23.05.2003 Original published format: US 473173 P | [2006/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2004105692 | Date: | 09.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1633695 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2004 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1633695 | Date: | 15.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07C215/56, A61K31/137, A61P21/00 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
C07C215/54 (EP,US);
A61P1/06 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P13/10 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P23/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/12 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2006/11] | C07C211/01, A61K31/135 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/11] | Title | German: | GLATTMUSKELSPASMOLYTIKA | [2006/11] | English: | SMOOTH MUSCLE SPASMOLYTIC AGENTS | [2006/11] | French: | AGENTS SPASMOLYTIQUES POUR MUSCLES LISSES | [2006/11] | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2005 | Search fee paid | 03.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2004 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 27.10.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/11] | 29.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 16.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.05.2004 | AT | 15.02.2012 | BE | 15.02.2012 | CY | 15.02.2012 | CZ | 15.02.2012 | DK | 15.02.2012 | EE | 15.02.2012 | FI | 15.02.2012 | IT | 15.02.2012 | NL | 15.02.2012 | PL | 15.02.2012 | RO | 15.02.2012 | SE | 15.02.2012 | SI | 15.02.2012 | SK | 15.02.2012 | TR | 15.02.2012 | BG | 15.05.2012 | GR | 16.05.2012 | IE | 21.05.2012 | LU | 21.05.2012 | ES | 26.05.2012 | CH | 31.05.2012 | LI | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | PT | 15.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
TR | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IE | 21.05.2012 | ||
LU | 21.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
TR | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IE | 21.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
BG | 15.05.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IE | 21.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IE | 21.05.2012 | ||
ES | 26.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
IE | 21.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 15.02.2012 | |
BE | 15.02.2012 | ||
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
IT | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
SK | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 15.02.2012 | ||
DK | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
RO | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
SI | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
EE | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
SE | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
CY | 15.02.2012 | ||
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 15.02.2012 | |
FI | 15.02.2012 | ||
NL | 15.02.2012 | ||
PL | 15.02.2012 | ||
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
PT | 15.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | NL | 15.02.2012 | |
GR | 16.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | NL | 15.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3446901 (JONES GERAINT) [X] 1 * column 3, lines 26,27 *; | [X]GB1453394 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD) [X] 1 * page 7, line 46; example 5; compound 1 * * sentence 1; example 6 * * claim 13 *; | [X]DE2617486 (MARPHA SOC) [X] 1 * page 8, lines 7,8 *; | [X]US4249002 (ERIKSOO EDGAR) [X] 1 * sentence 26 - sentence 27; example 7 * * sentence 30 - sentence 31; example 7 *; | [XA]EP0325571 (KABIVITRUM AB [SE]) [X] 1 * examples 6,d),e),f),l) * * examples 18,q) * * examples 22,a); claim - * [A] 2-8; | [A]EP0420120 (HOKURIKU PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9640097 (NPS PHARMA INC [US]) [X] 1 * compounds 67,68,72 *; | [A]WO9800390 (BRIDGE PHARMA INC [US], et al) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [DA]US6310103 (ABERG GUNNAR [US]) [DA] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [X] - ZHOU, XINBO ET AL, "Synthesis of 3-(2-alkoxy-5-methylphenyl)-3-phenylpropylamines", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 139:68991, URL: STN, XP002456786 [X] 1-5 * abstract * | [X] - MIYACHI H ET AL, "Novel imidazole derivatives with subtype-selective antimuscarinic activity (1)", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (19980721), vol. 8, no. 14, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 1807 - 1812, XP004137135 [X] 1,3-5 * page 1809; table 1; compound 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(98)00312-6 | [X] - EASTON, NELSON R. ET AL, "Acetylenic amines. IV", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 57:55898, URL: STN, XP002456787 [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - BLANK, BENJAMIN ET AL, "Synthesis and adrenocortical inhibiting activity of substituted diphenylalkylamines", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 70:96281, URL: STN, XP002456788 [X] 1 * abstract * | [PX] - BALAYAN, R. S. ET AL, "Synthesis and antiarrhythmic properties of some N-substituted 3-(2-hydroxy-3,4-dimethylphenyl)-3-phenylpropylamines", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 143:346868, URL: STN, XP002456789 [PX] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]WO0136375 (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) | by applicant | WO9800390 | US6310103 | - ANDERSSON ET AL., J.ORG. CHEM., (1998), vol. 63, page 8067 | - NICOLAS ET AL., J. ORG. CHEM., (1993), vol. 58, page 766 | US20010775060 |