|
05.11.2012 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2012 |
Confirmation of the correction of a decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2012 |
Request for correction of the publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.11.2011 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.07.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
60 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2011 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2009 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
11.08.2009 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.2009 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.12.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.10.2008 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.08.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.08.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.05.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
07.03.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.03.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
07.03.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.02.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
01.02.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.12.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.07.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.07.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.06.2007 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2007 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.05.2007 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2007 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2007 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.05.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Certificate of deposit of biological material |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.03.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
06.03.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
05.01.2006 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.03.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
90 |
|
03.03.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.03.2005 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
64 |