Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008144891 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80783707 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008144890 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80788707 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008144889 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80768107 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008109992 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71621607 | 09.03.2007 | US78616507 | 11.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008014583 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US46209206 | 03.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008011710 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2009 | A8 | WO2008011710 | 31.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US49340706 | 26.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007101332 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37025506 | 07.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007101331 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37020306 | 07.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007098575 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007095749 | Global Dossier | 29.01.2009 | A8 | WO2007095749 | 30.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77646606 | 24.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007095748 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77646606 | 24.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007095747 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36115306 | 24.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2007095729 | Global Dossier | 16.07.2009 | A8 | WO2007095729 | 30.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36245206 | 24.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006072166 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US64205705 | 03.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006032127 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94984604 | 24.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006029497 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94466404 | 15.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005093048 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81016304 | 26.03.2004 | US7996905 | 14.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005092377 | Global Dossier | 22.03.2007 | A9 | WO2005092377 | 06.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81075104 | 26.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005092376 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81074404 | 26.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005092375 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81016504 | 26.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005083064 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US54866704 | 26.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004112834 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004089989 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US41375503 | 14.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004087205 | Global Dossier | 14.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US40351603 | 31.03.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004065422 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2004 | A3 | WO2004065422 | 05.08.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US74345103 | 19.12.2003 | US60300603 | 23.06.2003 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | US76212904 | 20.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004065421 | Global Dossier | 05.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34828403 | 21.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6794494 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2004 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US41375503 | 14.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013315896 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71621607 | 09.03.2007 | US78616507 | 11.04.2007 | US81016504 | 26.03.2004 | US201113243870 | 23.09.2011 | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | US201313764724 | 11.02.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012201751 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113310917 | 05.12.2011 | US81016504 | 26.03.2004 | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US80788707 | 30.05.2007 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012107233 | Global Dossier | 03.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81016504 | 26.03.2004 | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | US21727908 | 01.07.2008 | US201113210183 | 15.08.2011 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8388961 | Global Dossier | 05.03.2013 | B2 | US2012020880 | 26.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71621607 | 09.03.2007 | US78616507 | 11.04.2007 | US81016504 | 26.03.2004 | US201113243870 | 23.09.2011 | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010166652 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81016304 | 26.03.2004 | US21719108 | 01.07.2008 | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US7996905 | 14.03.2005 | US71364203 | 13.11.2003 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009208411 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37833209 | 13.02.2009 | US81016504 | 26.03.2004 | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | US59251606 | 03.11.2006 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009191118 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70967607 | 22.02.2007 | US22920308 | 20.08.2008 | US77646606 | 24.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009155262 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36245206 | 24.02.2006 | US28413708 | 18.09.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009142263 | Global Dossier | 04.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22918708 | 20.08.2008 | US77646606 | 24.02.2006 | US70989807 | 22.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009098045 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81074404 | 26.03.2004 | US74345103 | 19.12.2003 | US31329808 | 19.11.2008 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | US94984604 | 24.09.2004 | US76212904 | 20.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009053215 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60300603 | 23.06.2003 | US10298308 | 15.04.2008 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | US81075104 | 26.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009047213 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80768107 | 30.05.2007 | US94466404 | 15.09.2004 | US97578107 | 22.10.2007 | US8265908 | 11.04.2008 | US36115306 | 24.02.2006 | US41375503 | 14.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009022722 | Global Dossier | 22.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94466404 | 15.09.2004 | US54866704 | 26.02.2004 | US6736605 | 25.02.2005 | US22036208 | 23.07.2008 | US36115306 | 24.02.2006 | US41375503 | 14.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009004103 | Global Dossier | 01.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97589707 | 22.10.2007 | US87967607 | 18.07.2007 | US81016504 | 26.03.2004 | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US8264908 | 11.04.2008 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008305104 | Global Dossier | 11.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70967607 | 22.02.2007 | US97589607 | 22.10.2007 | US97578107 | 22.10.2007 | US77646606 | 24.02.2006 | US8264708 | 11.04.2008 | US80783707 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8017117 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2011 | B2 | US2008274049 | 06.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81016504 | 26.03.2004 | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | US21727908 | 01.07.2008 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008260635 | Global Dossier | 23.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10295308 | 15.04.2008 | US81074404 | 26.03.2004 | US74345103 | 19.12.2003 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | US76212904 | 20.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8071072 | Global Dossier | 06.12.2011 | B2 | US2008219919 | 11.09.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81016504 | 26.03.2004 | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US80788707 | 30.05.2007 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008213267 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70967607 | 22.02.2007 | US97589607 | 22.10.2007 | US77646606 | 24.02.2006 | US80783707 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008213171 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10266208 | 14.04.2008 | US74345103 | 19.12.2003 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | US76212904 | 20.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008213169 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80768107 | 30.05.2007 | US94466404 | 15.09.2004 | US97578107 | 22.10.2007 | US36115306 | 24.02.2006 | US41375503 | 14.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008131429 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US87967607 | 18.07.2007 | US81016504 | 26.03.2004 | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008131428 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70967607 | 22.02.2007 | US77646606 | 24.02.2006 | US80783707 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008124327 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US97589707 | 22.10.2007 | US87967607 | 18.07.2007 | US81016504 | 26.03.2004 | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008044408 | Global Dossier | 21.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60300603 | 23.06.2003 | US32162405 | 29.12.2005 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | US81075104 | 26.03.2004 | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US38700706 | 22.03.2006 | US36779806 | 03.03.2006 | US64205705 | 03.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008025977 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80768107 | 30.05.2007 | US94466404 | 15.09.2004 | US36115306 | 24.02.2006 | US41375503 | 14.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008019965 | Global Dossier | 24.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US71364203 | 13.11.2003 | US77755107 | 13.07.2007 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008015338 | Global Dossier | 17.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22671602 | 22.08.2002 | US72737000 | 29.11.2000 | US24172105 | 30.09.2005 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | US77429307 | 06.07.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8048416 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2011 | B2 | US2007248538 | 25.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71621607 | 09.03.2007 | US78616507 | 11.04.2007 | US81016504 | 26.03.2004 | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7420040 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2008 | B2 | US2007202113 | 30.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US70967607 | 22.02.2007 | US77646606 | 24.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7420041 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2008 | B2 | US2007202043 | 30.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77646606 | 24.02.2006 | US70989807 | 22.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007189964 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71621607 | 09.03.2007 | US81016504 | 26.03.2004 | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7507537 | Global Dossier | 24.03.2009 | B2 | US2007053836 | 08.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81016504 | 26.03.2004 | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | US59251606 | 03.11.2006 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7442777 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2008 | B2 | US2007025912 | 01.02.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60300603 | 23.06.2003 | US36245206 | 24.02.2006 | US32162405 | 29.12.2005 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | US81075104 | 26.03.2004 | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US64205705 | 03.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7534429 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2009 | B2 | US2006269481 | 30.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60300603 | 23.06.2003 | US32162405 | 29.12.2005 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | US81075104 | 26.03.2004 | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US49340706 | 26.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7175846 | Global Dossier | 13.02.2007 | B2 | US2006263372 | 23.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US74345103 | 19.12.2003 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | US46209206 | 03.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7420039 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2008 | B2 | US2006240027 | 26.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US71364203 | 13.11.2003 | US38711506 | 22.03.2006 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006216235 | Global Dossier | 28.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89259704 | 15.07.2004 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | US37025506 | 07.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7488475 | Global Dossier | 10.02.2009 | B2 | US2006216234 | 28.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US74345103 | 19.12.2003 | US89186604 | 15.07.2004 | US37020306 | 07.03.2006 | US89259704 | 15.07.2004 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7947496 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2011 | B2 | US2006216233 | 28.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81016504 | 26.03.2004 | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006210474 | Global Dossier | 21.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60300603 | 23.06.2003 | US32162405 | 29.12.2005 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | US81075104 | 26.03.2004 | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US36779806 | 03.03.2006 | US64205705 | 03.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7431923 | Global Dossier | 07.10.2008 | B2 | US2006204497 | 14.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US32162405 | 29.12.2005 | US64205705 | 03.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006140963 | Global Dossier | 29.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94466404 | 15.09.2004 | US36115306 | 24.02.2006 | US41375503 | 14.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7247476 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2007 | B2 | US2006073153 | 06.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22671602 | 22.08.2002 | US72737000 | 29.11.2000 | US24172105 | 30.09.2005 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2006073144 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24078705 | 30.09.2005 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | US22675602 | 22.08.2002 | US72736900 | 29.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7419792 | Global Dossier | 02.09.2008 | B2 | US2005244899 | 03.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81016304 | 26.03.2004 | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US7996905 | 14.03.2005 | US71364203 | 13.11.2003 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7399835 | Global Dossier | 15.07.2008 | B2 | US2005191305 | 01.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US54866704 | 26.02.2004 | US6736605 | 25.02.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005100542 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81016504 | 26.03.2004 | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7468254 | Global Dossier | 23.12.2008 | B2 | US2005063967 | 24.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81074404 | 26.03.2004 | US74345103 | 19.12.2003 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | US94984604 | 24.09.2004 | US76212904 | 20.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7195764 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2007 | B2 | US2005053609 | 10.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94466404 | 15.09.2004 | US41375503 | 14.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7189397 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2007 | B2 | US2005008646 | 13.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7186808 | Global Dossier | 06.03.2007 | B2 | US2005002940 | 06.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89186604 | 15.07.2004 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7361343 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2008 | B2 | US2004258693 | 23.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60300603 | 23.06.2003 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | US81075104 | 26.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7189825 | Global Dossier | 13.03.2007 | B2 | US2004253653 | 16.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US89259704 | 15.07.2004 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7393531 | Global Dossier | 01.07.2008 | B2 | US2004197328 | 07.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81074404 | 26.03.2004 | US74345103 | 19.12.2003 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | US76212904 | 20.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7442776 | Global Dossier | 28.10.2008 | B2 | US2004180002 | 16.09.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81016304 | 26.03.2004 | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US71364203 | 13.11.2003 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7361342 | Global Dossier | 22.04.2008 | B2 | US2004151665 | 05.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US74345103 | 19.12.2003 | US60300603 | 23.06.2003 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | US76212904 | 20.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004141979 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US74345103 | 19.12.2003 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7256271 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2007 | B2 | US2004141915 | 22.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34828403 | 21.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7009040 | Global Dossier | 07.03.2006 | B2 | US2004141913 | 22.07.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004105816 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60300603 | 23.06.2003 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | US34828403 | 21.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7252821 | Global Dossier | 07.08.2007 | B2 | US2004105815 | 03.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | US41375503 | 14.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7256272 | Global Dossier | 14.08.2007 | B2 | US2004101530 | 27.05.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US71364203 | 13.11.2003 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2004001789 | Global Dossier | 01.01.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US40351603 | 31.03.2003 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20100003366 | Global Dossier | 08.01.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US80783707 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20090130335 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US80768107 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20090057970 | Global Dossier | 08.06.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US49340706 | 26.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20090047448 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US46209206 | 03.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101131401B | Global Dossier | 12.07.2012 | B1 | KR20100006163 | 18.01.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US80788707 | 30.05.2007 | WO2008CA00978 | 23.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013165710 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013144707 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US80788707 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2013144700 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US71621607 | 09.03.2007 | US78616507 | 11.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5367776B | Global Dossier | 11.12.2013 | B2 | JP2012013709 | 19.01.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US81016504 | 26.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010530361 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US80768107 | 30.05.2007 | WO2008CA00977 | 23.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5363464B | Global Dossier | 11.12.2013 | B2 | JP2010529955 | 02.09.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US80788707 | 30.05.2007 | WO2008CA00978 | 23.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010528056 | Global Dossier | 19.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008CA00979 | 23.05.2008 | US80783707 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010521426 | Global Dossier | 24.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US71621607 | 09.03.2007 | US78616507 | 11.04.2007 | WO2008CA00449 | 10.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009545533 | Global Dossier | 24.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006CA01879 | 17.11.2006 | US46209206 | 03.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009544629 | Global Dossier | 17.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007CA01317 | 24.07.2007 | US49340706 | 26.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009531293 | Global Dossier | 03.09.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US36115306 | 24.02.2006 | WO2007CA00280 | 22.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5247474B | Global Dossier | 24.07.2013 | B2 | JP2009529497 | 20.08.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007CA00281 | 23.02.2007 | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009529010 | Global Dossier | 13.08.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US37025506 | 07.03.2006 | WO2007CA00344 | 05.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009529009 | Global Dossier | 13.08.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US37020306 | 07.03.2006 | WO2007CA00343 | 05.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009528995 | Global Dossier | 13.08.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007CA00282 | 23.02.2007 | US77646606 | 24.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009527507 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US36245206 | 24.02.2006 | WO2007CA00254 | 22.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2009527230 | Global Dossier | 30.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007CA00283 | 23.02.2007 | US77646606 | 24.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008545615 | Global Dossier | 18.12.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA01986 | 30.12.2005 | US64205705 | 03.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008514550 | Global Dossier | 08.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US94984604 | 24.09.2004 | WO2005CA00450 | 24.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008513361 | Global Dossier | 01.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US94466404 | 15.09.2004 | WO2005CA00363 | 10.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2008504227 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA00302 | 28.02.2005 | US54866704 | 26.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007530460 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US81016304 | 26.03.2004 | WO2005CA00456 | 29.03.2005 | US7996905 | 14.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007530458 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US81075104 | 26.03.2004 | WO2005CA00443 | 23.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007530457 | Global Dossier | 01.11.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US81074404 | 26.03.2004 | WO2005CA00442 | 23.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4839305B | Global Dossier | 21.12.2011 | B2 | JP2007530456 | 01.11.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US81016504 | 26.03.2004 | WO2005CA00441 | 23.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4680186B | Global Dossier | 11.05.2011 | B2 | JP2007523851 | 23.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004CA00845 | 08.06.2004 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007523838 | Global Dossier | 23.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004CA00481 | 31.03.2004 | US41375503 | 14.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4726777B | Global Dossier | 20.07.2011 | B2 | JP2007523834 | 23.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US74345103 | 19.12.2003 | US60300603 | 23.06.2003 | WO2004CA00059 | 21.01.2004 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | US76212904 | 20.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4981448B | Global Dossier | 18.07.2012 | B2 | JP2007503377 | 22.02.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004CA01546 | 20.08.2004 | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2508536 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07701821 | 23.02.2007 | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2322213 | Global Dossier | 18.05.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10007120 | 08.06.2004 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | EP04737787 | 08.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2260865 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | EP04737787 | 08.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2164874 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2013 | A4 | EP2164874 | 24.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80788707 | 30.05.2007 | WO2008CA00978 | 23.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2163564 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US74345103 | 19.12.2003 | US60300603 | 23.06.2003 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | US76212904 | 20.01.2004 | EP04703738 | 21.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2160412 | Global Dossier | 25.01.2012 | A4 | EP2160412 | 10.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80768107 | 30.05.2007 | WO2008CA00977 | 23.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2155791 | Global Dossier | 22.09.2010 | A4 | EP2155791 | 24.02.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008CA00979 | 23.05.2008 | US80783707 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2117593 | Global Dossier | 02.03.2011 | A4 | EP2117593 | 18.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71621607 | 09.03.2007 | US78616507 | 11.04.2007 | WO2008CA00449 | 10.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2073851 | Global Dossier | 21.04.2010 | A4 | EP2073851 | 01.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CA01317 | 24.07.2007 | US49340706 | 26.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2046381 | Global Dossier | 21.07.2010 | A4 | EP2046381 | 15.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006CA01879 | 17.11.2006 | US46209206 | 03.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1996701 | Global Dossier | 07.04.2010 | A4 | EP1996701 | 03.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CA00283 | 23.02.2007 | US77646606 | 24.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1996700 | Global Dossier | 14.04.2010 | A4 | EP1996700 | 03.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CA00282 | 23.02.2007 | US77646606 | 24.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1996624 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2009 | A4 | EP1996624 | 03.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37025506 | 07.03.2006 | WO2007CA00344 | 05.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1996623 | Global Dossier | 16.09.2009 | A4 | EP1996623 | 03.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37020306 | 07.03.2006 | WO2007CA00343 | 05.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1989233 | Global Dossier | 06.11.2013 | B1 | EP1989233 | 05.05.2010 | A4 | EP1989233 | 12.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CA00281 | 23.02.2007 | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1989232 | Global Dossier | 27.01.2010 | A4 | EP1989232 | 12.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36115306 | 24.02.2006 | WO2007CA00280 | 22.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1987138 | Global Dossier | 22.07.2009 | A4 | EP1987138 | 05.11.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36245206 | 24.02.2006 | WO2007CA00254 | 22.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1841795 | Global Dossier | 06.05.2009 | A4 | EP1841795 | 10.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA01986 | 30.12.2005 | US64205705 | 03.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1799712 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2008 | A4 | EP1799712 | 27.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94984604 | 24.09.2004 | WO2005CA00450 | 24.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1796721 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2009 | A4 | EP1796721 | 20.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94466404 | 15.09.2004 | WO2005CA00363 | 10.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1757620 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2007 | A3 | EP1757620 | 28.02.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP04724505 | 31.03.2004 | US41375503 | 14.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1735432 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2008 | A4 | EP1735432 | 27.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81016304 | 26.03.2004 | WO2005CA00456 | 29.03.2005 | US7996905 | 14.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1732603 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2008 | A4 | EP1732603 | 20.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81075104 | 26.03.2004 | WO2005CA00443 | 23.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1732602 | Global Dossier | 09.03.2011 | B1 | EP1732602 | 07.05.2008 | A4 | EP1732602 | 20.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81074404 | 26.03.2004 | WO2005CA00442 | 23.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1732601 | Global Dossier | 07.05.2008 | A4 | EP1732601 | 20.12.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81016504 | 26.03.2004 | WO2005CA00441 | 23.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1718737 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2010 | B1 | EP1718737 | 28.03.2007 | A4 | EP1718737 | 08.11.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA00302 | 28.02.2005 | US54866704 | 26.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1635869 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2012 | B1 | EP1635869 | 22.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004CA00845 | 08.06.2004 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1613656 | Global Dossier | 13.12.2006 | B1 | EP1613656 | 11.01.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004CA00481 | 31.03.2004 | US41375503 | 14.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1587836 | Global Dossier | 26.10.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US74345103 | 19.12.2003 | US60300603 | 23.06.2003 | WO2004CA00059 | 21.01.2004 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | US76212904 | 20.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2011200789B | Global Dossier | 30.01.2014 | B2 | AU2011200789 | 17.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2011200789 | 24.02.2011 | AU2004248865 | 08.06.2004 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | AU2004266045 | 20.08.2004 | WO2004CA00845 | 08.06.2004 | WO2004CA01546 | 20.08.2004 | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2008255528 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008CA00979 | 23.05.2008 | US80783707 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2008255527B | Global Dossier | 14.03.2013 | B2 | AU2008255527 | 04.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80788707 | 30.05.2007 | WO2008CA00978 | 23.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2008255526 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80768107 | 30.05.2007 | WO2008CA00977 | 23.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007278791 | Global Dossier | 31.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CA01317 | 24.07.2007 | US49340706 | 26.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007222843 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37025506 | 07.03.2006 | WO2007CA00344 | 05.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007222842 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37020306 | 07.03.2006 | WO2007CA00343 | 05.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007219656B | Global Dossier | 07.02.2013 | B2 | AU2007219656 | 07.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CA00281 | 23.02.2007 | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007219010 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36245206 | 24.02.2006 | WO2007CA00254 | 22.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007218962 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CA00283 | 23.02.2007 | US77646606 | 24.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007218961 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CA00282 | 23.02.2007 | US77646606 | 24.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007218960 | Global Dossier | 30.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36115306 | 24.02.2006 | WO2007CA00280 | 22.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2006346988 | Global Dossier | 07.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006CA01879 | 17.11.2006 | US46209206 | 03.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005324259 | Global Dossier | 13.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA01986 | 30.12.2005 | US64205705 | 03.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005287814 | Global Dossier | 30.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94984604 | 24.09.2004 | WO2005CA00450 | 24.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005284618 | Global Dossier | 23.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94466404 | 15.09.2004 | WO2005CA00363 | 10.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005226799 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81075104 | 26.03.2004 | WO2005CA00443 | 23.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005226798 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81074404 | 26.03.2004 | WO2005CA00442 | 23.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005226797B | Global Dossier | 18.08.2011 | B2 | AU2005226797 | 06.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81016504 | 26.03.2004 | WO2005CA00441 | 23.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005225472 | Global Dossier | 06.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81016304 | 26.03.2004 | WO2005CA00456 | 29.03.2005 | US7996905 | 14.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005217008 | Global Dossier | 09.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA00302 | 28.02.2005 | US54866704 | 26.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004266045B | Global Dossier | 17.03.2011 | B2 | AU2004266045 | 03.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2004248865 | 08.06.2004 | WO2004CA00845 | 08.06.2004 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | AU2004266045 | 20.08.2004 | WO2004CA01546 | 20.08.2004 | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004248865B | Global Dossier | 21.07.2011 | B2 | AU2004248865 | 29.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004CA00845 | 08.06.2004 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004228078 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004CA00481 | 31.03.2004 | US41375503 | 14.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004205435B | Global Dossier | 03.02.2011 | B2 | AU2004205435 | 05.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US74345103 | 19.12.2003 | US60300603 | 23.06.2003 | WO2004CA00059 | 21.01.2004 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | US76212904 | 20.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1667716 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2012 | B8 | EP1667716 | 28.12.2011 | B1 | EP1667716 | 16.05.2007 | A4 | EP1667716 | 14.06.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004CA01546 | 20.08.2004 | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE348112T | 15.01.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US41375503 | 14.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE469220T | 15.06.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA00302 | 28.02.2005 | US54866704 | 26.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE500844T | 15.03.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US81074404 | 26.03.2004 | WO2005CA00442 | 23.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE538811T | 15.01.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004CA01546 | 20.08.2004 | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0621921 | 20.12.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2006CA01879 | 17.11.2006 | US46209206 | 03.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0715541 | 24.09.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CA01317 | 24.07.2007 | US49340706 | 26.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0812083 | 25.11.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US80768107 | 30.05.2007 | WO2008CA00977 | 23.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0812488 | 09.12.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US80788707 | 30.05.2007 | WO2008CA00978 | 23.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2513772 | 05.08.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US74345103 | 19.12.2003 | US60300603 | 23.06.2003 | WO2004CA00059 | 21.01.2004 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | US76212904 | 20.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2521375 | 21.10.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004CA00481 | 31.03.2004 | US41375503 | 14.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2530214 | 29.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004CA00845 | 08.06.2004 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2536359 | 03.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004CA01546 | 20.08.2004 | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2557093 | 09.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA00302 | 28.02.2005 | US54866704 | 26.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2560859 | 06.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81016504 | 26.03.2004 | WO2005CA00441 | 23.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2560862 | 06.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81074404 | 26.03.2004 | WO2005CA00442 | 23.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2560864 | 06.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81075104 | 26.03.2004 | WO2005CA00443 | 23.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2561192 | 06.10.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US81016304 | 26.03.2004 | WO2005CA00456 | 29.03.2005 | US7996905 | 14.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2579900 | 23.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94466404 | 15.09.2004 | WO2005CA00363 | 10.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2579905 | 30.03.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US94984604 | 24.09.2004 | WO2005CA00450 | 24.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2594143 | 13.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA01986 | 30.12.2005 | US64205705 | 03.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2643059 | 30.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36245206 | 24.02.2006 | WO2007CA00254 | 22.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2643555 | 30.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US36115306 | 24.02.2006 | WO2007CA00280 | 22.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2643561 | 30.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CA00282 | 23.02.2007 | US77646606 | 24.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2643603 | 30.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CA00283 | 23.02.2007 | US77646606 | 24.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2643708 | 07.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CA00281 | 23.02.2007 | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2644774 | 13.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37020306 | 07.03.2006 | WO2007CA00343 | 05.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2644782 | 13.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US37025506 | 07.03.2006 | WO2007CA00344 | 05.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2658504 | 07.02.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2006CA01879 | 17.11.2006 | US46209206 | 03.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2666464 | 31.01.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CA01317 | 24.07.2007 | US49340706 | 26.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2679050 | 18.09.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71621607 | 09.03.2007 | US78616507 | 11.04.2007 | WO2008CA00449 | 10.03.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2687575 | 04.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80768107 | 30.05.2007 | WO2008CA00977 | 23.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2687583 | 06.05.2014 | C | CA2687583 | 04.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80788707 | 30.05.2007 | WO2008CA00978 | 23.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2687586 | 04.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008CA00979 | 23.05.2008 | US80783707 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100588662C | 10.02.2010 | C | CN1802387 | 12.07.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US41375503 | 14.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101023164 | 22.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US81016304 | 26.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101084013 | 05.12.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US94466404 | 15.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101107267 | 16.01.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US94984604 | 24.09.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101189266 | 28.05.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US64205705 | 03.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101214376 | 09.07.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US81075104 | 26.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101254303 | 03.09.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US81074404 | 26.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101279093 | 08.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US81016504 | 26.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101389658 | 18.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US36115306 | 24.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101421395 | 29.04.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US36245206 | 24.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101426904 | 06.05.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US77646606 | 24.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101432307B | 12.06.2013 | B | CN101432307 | 13.05.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007CA00281 | 23.02.2007 | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101432422 | 13.05.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US77646606 | 24.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101437851 | 20.05.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US37020306 | 07.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101454346 | 10.06.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US37025506 | 07.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101534857 | 16.09.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US46209206 | 03.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101553259 | 07.10.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US49340706 | 26.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101663049 | 03.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US71621607 | 09.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101679526 | 24.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008CA00979 | 23.05.2008 | US80783707 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101687930 | 31.03.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US80788707 | 30.05.2007 | WO2008CA00978 | 23.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101961496 | 02.02.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US74345103 | 19.12.2003 | US60300603 | 23.06.2003 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | US76212904 | 20.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103197067 | 10.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103204934 | 17.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US80788707 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1761683 | 19.04.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1849136B | 22.12.2010 | B | CN1849136 | 18.10.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004CA00845 | 08.06.2004 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1901936B | 08.08.2012 | B | CN1901936 | 24.01.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004CA01546 | 20.08.2004 | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1934246 | 21.03.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US54866704 | 26.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1960754 | 09.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US81016504 | 26.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1960755 | 09.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US81074404 | 26.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1960756 | 09.05.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US81075104 | 26.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO6140062 | 19.03.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US80783707 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CO6241160 | 20.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US80788707 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CR11125 | 29.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US80788707 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CR11127 | 29.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US80783707 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1106455T | 12.10.2011 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004CA00481 | 31.03.2004 | US41375503 | 14.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1115212T | 04.01.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP07701821 | 23.02.2007 | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602004003689T | 04.10.2007 | T2 | DE602004003689D1 | 25.01.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004CA00481 | 31.03.2004 | US41375503 | 14.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602005021459D1 | 08.07.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA00302 | 28.02.2005 | US54866704 | 26.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE602005026789D1 | 21.04.2011 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US81074404 | 26.03.2004 | WO2005CA00442 | 23.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1613656T | 12.03.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2004CA00481 | 31.03.2004 | US41375503 | 14.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1718737T | 09.08.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA00302 | 28.02.2005 | US54866704 | 26.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1989233T | 13.01.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CA00281 | 23.02.2007 | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ECSP099769 | 28.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US80788707 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ECSP099770 | 28.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US80783707 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2278309T | 01.08.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US41375503 | 14.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2345260T | 20.09.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US54866704 | 26.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2379155T | 23.04.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2004CA01546 | 20.08.2004 | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2394643T | 04.02.2013 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2004CA00845 | 08.06.2004 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2444408T | 24.02.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CA00281 | 23.02.2007 | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2449044 | 26.11.2008 | A8 | GB2449044 | 05.11.2008 | A | GB0816303D0 | 15.10.2008 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US36245206 | 24.02.2006 | WO2007CA00254 | 22.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0816513D0 | 15.10.2008 | D0 | Priority number | Date | US36245206 | 24.02.2006 | WO2007CA00254 | 22.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1096866 | 15.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004CA00845 | 08.06.2004 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1120527 | 03.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CA00281 | 23.02.2007 | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA31393 | 03.05.2010 | B1 | Priority number | Date | WO2008CA00979 | 23.05.2008 | US80783707 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MA31662 | 01.09.2010 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US80788707 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2007008123 | 07.09.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA01986 | 30.12.2005 | US64205705 | 03.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2008010815 | 06.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US36245206 | 24.02.2006 | WO2007CA00254 | 22.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2008011480 | 25.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US37020306 | 07.03.2006 | WO2007CA00343 | 05.03.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2009001014 | 22.06.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007CA01317 | 24.07.2007 | US49340706 | 26.07.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2009001292 | 15.09.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2006CA01879 | 17.11.2006 | US46209206 | 03.08.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2009012606 | 07.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US80768107 | 30.05.2007 | WO2008CA00977 | 23.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2009012672 | 11.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US80788707 | 30.05.2007 | WO2008CA00978 | 23.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2009012732 | 10.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2008CA00979 | 23.05.2008 | US80783707 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA06010936 | 21.03.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US81075104 | 26.03.2004 | WO2005CA00443 | 23.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ541366 | 30.06.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | US74345103 | 19.12.2003 | US60300603 | 23.06.2003 | WO2004CA00059 | 21.01.2004 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | US76212904 | 20.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ542927 | 30.04.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004CA00481 | 31.03.2004 | US41375503 | 14.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ544440 | 31.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004CA00845 | 08.06.2004 | US60300003 | 23.06.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ545477 | 25.09.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2004CA01546 | 20.08.2004 | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ549409 | 24.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005CA00302 | 28.02.2005 | US54866704 | 26.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ550044 | 24.12.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US81016304 | 26.03.2004 | WO2005CA00456 | 29.03.2005 | US7996905 | 14.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ550045 | 30.10.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US81016504 | 26.03.2004 | WO2005CA00441 | 23.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ550046 | 31.03.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US81074404 | 26.03.2004 | WO2005CA00442 | 23.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ553855 | 28.02.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US94466404 | 15.09.2004 | WO2005CA00363 | 10.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ565076 | 31.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US74345103 | 19.12.2003 | US60300603 | 23.06.2003 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | US76212904 | 20.01.2004 | NZ54136604 | 21.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ565077 | 31.03.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US74345103 | 19.12.2003 | US60300603 | 23.06.2003 | US34823103 | 21.01.2003 | US76212904 | 20.01.2004 | NZ54136604 | 21.01.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ570776 | 31.03.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007CA00281 | 23.02.2007 | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ581507 | 30.03.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US80788707 | 30.05.2007 | WO2008CA00978 | 23.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ597067 | 31.08.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ58150708 | 23.05.2008 | US80788707 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH12014500679 | 03.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80788707 | 30.05.2007 | WO2008CA00978 | 23.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1613656T | 30.04.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2004CA00481 | 31.03.2004 | EP04724505 | 31.03.2004 | US41375503 | 14.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1718737T | 29.10.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP05714544 | 28.02.2005 | WO2005CA00302 | 28.02.2005 | US54866704 | 26.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1989233T | 30.04.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CA00281 | 23.02.2007 | EP07701821 | 23.02.2007 | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1613656E | 28.02.2007 | E | Priority number | Date | US41375503 | 14.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1718737E | 09.08.2010 | E | Priority number | Date | US54866704 | 26.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1989233E | 11.02.2014 | E | Priority number | Date | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2487723 | 20.07.2013 | C2 | RU2009148600 | 10.07.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US80788707 | 30.05.2007 | WO2008CA00978 | 23.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2013107887 | 27.08.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US80788707 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG178787 | 29.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71621607 | 09.03.2007 | US78616507 | 11.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG188795 | 30.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US80788707 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1613656T | 30.04.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004CA00481 | 31.03.2004 | EP04724505 | 31.03.2004 | US41375503 | 14.04.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1718737T | 30.09.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP05714544 | 28.02.2005 | WO2005CA00302 | 28.02.2005 | US54866704 | 26.02.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1989233T | 28.02.2014 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007CA00281 | 23.02.2007 | EP07701821 | 23.02.2007 | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200637875 | 01.11.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US64205705 | 03.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200643418 | 16.12.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US7996905 | 14.03.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW200731987 | 01.09.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US36401306 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA98332 | 10.05.2012 | C2 | Priority number | Date | US80788707 | 30.05.2007 | WO2008CA00978 | 23.05.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2001003777 | 14.06.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US72737000 | 29.11.2000 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2001009665 | 26.07.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | US72736900 | 29.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6657048 | 02.12.2003 | B2 | US2002041877 | 11.04.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US72736100 | 29.11.2000 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003031672 | 13.02.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | US22675602 | 22.08.2002 | US72736900 | 29.11.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2003054006 | 20.03.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22671602 | 22.08.2002 | US72737000 | 29.11.2000 | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6180357 | 30.01.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US41527899 | 08.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200607960 | 30.07.2008 | B | Priority number | Date | US81075104 | 26.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200705259 | 26.11.2008 | B | Priority number | Date | US64205705 | 03.01.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200807723 | 26.08.2009 | B | Priority number | Date | US36245206 | 24.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200808502 | 29.07.2009 | B | Priority number | Date | US37020306 | 07.03.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200908341 | 25.08.2010 | B | Priority number | Date | US80768107 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200908344 | 25.08.2010 | B | Priority number | Date | US80788707 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200908346 | 25.08.2010 | B | Priority number | Date | US80783707 | 30.05.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005018667 | Global Dossier | 03.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5468587B | Global Dossier | 09.04.2014 | B2 | JP2012031183 | 16.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102778562B | 02.07.2014 | B | CN102778562 | 14.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1175846 | 12.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US64781803 | 22.08.2003 |