EP1667716 - CYTOTOXICITY MEDIATION OF CELLS EVIDENCING SURFACE EXPRESSION OF CD44 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacherstrasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2009/37] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states Arius Research, Inc. 55 York Street, 16th floor Torontoa Ontario M5J 1R7 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOUNG, David S. F. 33 University Avenue Suite 2407 Toronto, Ontario M5J 2S7 / CA | 02 /
HAHN, Susan, E. 9 Innisfree Court Toronto, Ontario M6P 3N7 / CA | 03 /
FINDLAY, Helen, P. 205 Glendonwynne Road Toronto, Ontario M6P 3E9 / CA | [2011/52] |
Former [2006/24] | 01 /
YOUNG, David S. F. 33 University Avenue, Suite 2407 Toronto, Ontario M5J 2S7 / CA | ||
02 /
HAHN, Susan, E. 9 Innisfree Court Toronto, Ontario M6P 3N7 / CA | |||
03 /
FINDLAY, Helen, P. 205 Glendonwynne Road Toronto, Ontario M6P 3E9 / CA | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/16] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/33] | Taylor, Kate Laura, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 106 Micklegate York YO1 6JX / GB | ||
Former [2006/24] | Hall, Robert Leonard, et al Harrison Goddard Foote Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04761710.5 | 20.08.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004CA01546 | Priority number, date | US20030647818 | 22.08.2003 Original published format: US 647818 | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005018667 | Date: | 03.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1667716 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1667716 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1667716 | Date: | 28.03.2012 | [2012/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 03.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61K47/48, C12Q1/04, G01N33/569, G01N33/574, A61P35/00, // C07K16/28 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
A61K49/0058 (EP,US);
A61K49/0041 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
C07K16/00 (EP,US);
C07K16/2884 (EP,US);
C07K16/30 (EP,US);
C07K16/3015 (EP,US);
G01N33/56972 (EP,US);
G01N33/57415 (EP,US);
G01N33/57419 (EP,US);
G01N33/57423 (EP,US);
G01N33/57449 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/24] | A61K39/395, A61K47/48, C12Q1/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Title | German: | ZYTOTOXIZITÄTSMEDIATION IN ZELLEN DIE AUF EINE OBERFLÄCHENEXPRESSION VON CD44 HINWEISEN | [2012/10] | English: | CYTOTOXICITY MEDIATION OF CELLS EVIDENCING SURFACE EXPRESSION OF CD44 | [2006/24] | French: | MISE EN EVIDENCE D'UNE EXPRESSION SURFACIELLE DU CD44 PAR LA CYTOTOXICITE DE CELLULES | [2012/10] |
Former [2006/24] | ZYTOTOXIZITÄTSVERMITTLUNG VON ZELLEN MIT HINWEISEN AUF OBERFLÄCHENEXPRESSION VON CD44 | ||
Former [2006/24] | MISE EN EVIDENCE L'EXPRESSION SURFACIELLE DU CD44 PAR L'INTERMEDIAIRE DE LA CYTOTOXICITE DE CELLULES | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 16.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 24.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 14.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 28.12.2011 | CZ | 28.12.2011 | DK | 28.12.2011 | EE | 28.12.2011 | PL | 28.12.2011 | PT | 28.12.2011 | RO | 28.12.2011 | SI | 28.12.2011 | SK | 28.12.2011 | TR | 28.12.2011 | BG | 28.03.2012 | GR | 29.03.2012 | LU | 20.08.2012 | MC | 31.08.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
TR | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
LU | 20.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
TR | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/16] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | SI | 28.12.2011 | |
GR | 29.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5616468 (SALMI MARKO [FI], et al) [DA] 1-28 * example . *; | [DA]US6180357 (YOUNG DAVID S F [CA], et al) [DA] 1-28 * example - * * claim . *; | [X]WO03055515 (ARIUS RES INC [CA]) [X] 1-28 * examples 1,5 * * claim - *; | [A] - D. NAOR ET AL., "CD44: Structure, function and association with the malignant process.", ADVANCES IN CANCER RESEARCH, U.S.A., (1997), vol. 71, pages 241 - 319, XP000952636 [A] 1-28 * chapters III, XI-XIV * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0065-230X(08)60101-3 | [A] - R. OOSTENDORP ET AL., "Evidence for differences in the mechanisms by which antibodies against CD44 promote adhesion of erythroid and granulopoietic progenitors to marrow stromal cells.", BRITISH JOURNAL OF HAEMATOLOGY, (1998), vol. 101, pages 436 - 445, XP002427339 [A] 1-28 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2141.1998.00746.x | International search | [X]US2002041877 (YOUNG DAVID S F [CA], et al); | [XP]US2004001789 (YOUNG DAVID S F [CA], et al) | by applicant | US5750102 | US5885575 | US5942417 | US6180357 | US2002041877 | WO03055515 | - NAOR ET AL., ADV CANCER RES., (1997), vol. 71, pages 241 - 319 | - OOSTENDORP ET AL., BR J HAEMATOL., (199806), vol. 101, no. 3, pages 436 - 45 |