EP1587674 - MULTILAYER SOUND-ABSORBING COMPONENT, IN PARTICULAR FOR MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carcoustics TechConsult GmbH Neuenkamp 8 51381 Leverkusen / DE | [2007/20] |
Former [2005/43] | For all designated states Carcoustics Tech Center GmbH Neuenkamp 8 51381 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KALLENBERG, Albert Annenstrasse 5 50354 Hürth / DE | [2005/43] | Representative(s) | Meyer, Hans-Joachim Cohausz & Florack Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/43] | Meyer, Hans-Joachim COHAUSZ & FLORACK Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 04765522.0 | 23.09.2004 | [2005/43] | WO2004EP10662 | Priority number, date | DE2003220102U | 23.12.2003 Original published format: DE 20320102 U | [2005/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005065933 | Date: | 21.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1587674 | Date: | 26.10.2005 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1587674 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.07.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B32B5/18, E04B1/80, B60N3/04 | [2005/43] | CPC: |
B32B5/18 (EP,US);
B32B5/02 (EP,US);
B32B7/04 (EP,US);
B60N3/048 (EP,US);
D06N7/0081 (EP,US);
D06N7/0084 (EP,US);
D06N7/0086 (EP,US);
D06N2201/02 (EP,US);
D06N2201/0254 (EP,US);
D06N2201/042 (EP,US);
D06N2203/068 (EP,US);
D06N2205/04 (EP,US);
D06N2205/10 (EP,US);
D06N2209/025 (EP,US);
D06N2209/121 (EP,US);
D06N2211/26 (EP,US);
D06N2213/04 (EP,US);
D06N2213/061 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGES, SCHALLABSORBIERENDES LEICHTBAUTEIL, INSBESONDERE FUER KRAFTFAHRZEUGE | [2005/43] | English: | MULTILAYER SOUND-ABSORBING COMPONENT, IN PARTICULAR FOR MOTOR VEHICLES | [2005/43] | French: | COMPOSANT LEGER MULTICOUCHE ABSORBANT LES SONS NOTAMMENT DESTINE A DES VEHICULES | [2005/43] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2005 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/43] | 24.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.12.2008 | CZ | 17.12.2008 | DK | 17.12.2008 | EE | 17.12.2008 | FI | 17.12.2008 | IE | 17.12.2008 | IT | 17.12.2008 | NL | 17.12.2008 | PL | 17.12.2008 | RO | 17.12.2008 | SI | 17.12.2008 | SK | 17.12.2008 | TR | 17.12.2008 | BG | 17.03.2009 | SE | 17.03.2009 | GR | 18.03.2009 | ES | 28.03.2009 | PT | 18.05.2009 | HU | 18.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 17.12.2008 | |
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IE | 17.12.2008 | ||
IT | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
HU | 18.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CZ | 17.12.2008 | |
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IE | 17.12.2008 | ||
IT | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | CZ | 17.12.2008 | |
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IE | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | CZ | 17.12.2008 | |
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IE | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | CZ | 17.12.2008 | |
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IE | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CZ | 17.12.2008 | |
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IE | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
PT | 18.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | EE | 17.12.2008 | |
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IE | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | FI | 17.12.2008 | |
IE | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 17.12.2008 | |
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3430775 (STANKIEWICZ ALOIS DR GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-18 * page 11, lines 1-5 *; | [A]DE8812664U (JOHANN BORGERS GMBH CO KG) [A] 1 * figure 2 *; | [A]DE3905607 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1-18* figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE29619592U (HP CHEMIE PELZER RES & DEV [IE]) [A] 1 * page 3, column 5 - page 4, column 2 *; | [A]CA2280424 (SOLENO TEXTILES TECH INC [CA]) [A] 1 * page 3, column 4 *; | [AD]DE19960945 (AUDI AG [DE]) [AD] 1,3,4,6,8 * column 2, lines 10-20 * |