EP1573109 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DIGITALLY UPGRADING TEXTILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ten Cate Advanced Textiles B.V. Campbellweg 30 7443 PV Nijverdal / NL | [2006/12] |
Former [2005/37] | For all designated states Ten Cate Advanced Composites B.V. Campbellweg 30 7443 PV Nijverdal / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CRAAMER, Johannes, Antonius De Kampen 48 NL-6943 HE Meppel / NL | [2005/37] | Representative(s) | Clarkson, Paul Magnus, et al Howrey LLP PO Box 94361 1090 GJ Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Clarkson, Paul Magnus, et al Howrey LLP P.O. Box 94361 1090 GJ Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2006/14] | Clarkson, Paul Magnus, et al Howrey LLP Rembrandt Tower 31st Floor Amstelplein 1 PO Box 94361 1090 GJ Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2005/37] | Clarkson, Paul Magnus, et al Howrey Simon Arnold & White, CityPoint, 1 Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9HS / GB | Application number, filing date | 04765578.2 | 22.09.2004 | [2005/37] | WO2004EP10732 | Priority number, date | NL20031024338 | 22.09.2003 Original published format: NL 1024338 | WO2003NL00841 | 28.11.2003 Original published format: PCT/NL0300/841 | [2005/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005028730 | Date: | 31.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1573109 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2005/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1573109 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D06B11/00, B41J11/00 | [2005/37] | CPC: |
B41J3/4078 (EP,US);
B41J3/407 (KR);
B41J11/0015 (EP,US);
B41J11/002 (EP,US);
B41J11/00216 (EP,US);
B41J11/007 (EP,US);
B41J3/54 (KR);
B41J3/543 (EP,US);
B41J3/60 (EP,KR,US);
D06B11/00 (KR);
D06B11/0059 (EP,US);
D06B11/0073 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2005/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGZUR DIGITALEN TEXTILVEREDELUNG | [2005/37] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DIGITALLY UPGRADING TEXTILE | [2005/37] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF D'AMELIORATION NUMERIQUE DES TEXTILES | [2005/37] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2005 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2005 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2005 | Examination requested [2005/37] | 16.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.11.2006 | CH | 15.11.2006 | CY | 15.11.2006 | CZ | 15.11.2006 | EE | 15.11.2006 | FI | 15.11.2006 | LI | 15.11.2006 | RO | 15.11.2006 | SI | 15.11.2006 | SK | 15.11.2006 | TR | 15.11.2006 | BG | 15.02.2007 | DK | 15.02.2007 | SE | 15.02.2007 | PT | 16.04.2007 | HU | 16.05.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
CH | 15.11.2006 | ||
CY | 15.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2006 | ||
EE | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
RO | 15.11.2006 | ||
SI | 15.11.2006 | ||
SK | 15.11.2006 | ||
BG | 15.02.2007 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
HU | 16.05.2007 | ||
Former [2009/10] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
CH | 15.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2006 | ||
EE | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
RO | 15.11.2006 | ||
SI | 15.11.2006 | ||
SK | 15.11.2006 | ||
BG | 15.02.2007 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
CH | 15.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
RO | 15.11.2006 | ||
SI | 15.11.2006 | ||
SK | 15.11.2006 | ||
BG | 15.02.2007 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/44] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
CH | 15.11.2006 | ||
CZ | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
RO | 15.11.2006 | ||
SI | 15.11.2006 | ||
BG | 15.02.2007 | ||
DK | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
PT | 16.04.2007 | ||
Former [2007/30] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
CH | 15.11.2006 | ||
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
LI | 15.11.2006 | ||
BG | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | ||
Former [2007/29] | AT | 15.11.2006 | |
FI | 15.11.2006 | ||
BG | 15.02.2007 | ||
SE | 15.02.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4501038 (OTTING BILLY J [US]); | [X]US4580304 (OTTING DAVID L [US], et al) [X] 1,7,10-12,18,20,23,24 * column 3, line 4 - column 4, line 18 *; | [A]GB2187419 (DAWSON ELLIS LTD) [A] 1,7,10,12-14,18-20,23,24 * page 1, line 104 - page 2, line 12 * * page 2, line 61 - line 72 * * page 2, line 91 - line 95 * * page 3, line 32 - line 81 * * page 3, line 95 - page 4, line 6 *; | [A]US4791434 (WILLS LESLIE J [AU]) [A] 5 * figure 4; claim 1 *; | [X]US6120560 (MILLER SCOTT C [US], et al) [X] 1,7,9-12,18,20,23,24 * column 3, line 32 - line 64 * * column 4, line 12 - line 50 *; | [X]US2003081094 (VAN VEEN MARK ANDREAS [US], et al) [X] 1,7,8,10-14,18,20,23,24 * paragraphs [0002] , [0016] - [0018] - [0030] , [0034] , [0037] - [0039] - [0049] - [0054] * |