|
10.06.2015 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2014 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2014 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.06.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2014 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.06.2014 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.06.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.2014 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2014 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.02.2014 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2014 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
19.09.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2013 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2013 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.03.2013 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2012 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2012 |
Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.07.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.07.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.05.2011 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.03.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.02.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
01.02.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2010 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.06.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2008 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.05.2008 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.03.2008 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.01.2007 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2006 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.02.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.2006 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.01.2006 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.01.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.12.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2005 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.11.2005 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.01.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
26.01.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
06.01.2005 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
27 |