13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
29.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] |
06.11.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
12.06.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] |
01.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2015 [2015/23] |
24.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
13.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
06.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] |
30.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
23.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2015 [2015/09] |
04.07.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 06.08.2014 [2014/32] |
29.06.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
29.06.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
26.06.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
13.05.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.02.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
31.01.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
20.09.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.06.2013 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.05.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.03.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
11.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.07.2011 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
20.05.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.03.2011 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.07.2010 |
Change - representative |
published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] |
22.05.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.02.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.11.2009 |
First examination report |
|
06.11.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] |
05.11.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.06.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.07.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.02.2008 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 19.03.2008 [2008/12] |
04.07.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.09.2006 |
Change - extension states |
published on 04.10.2006 [2006/40] |
29.06.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.02.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] |
03.02.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] |
01.02.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.01.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.01.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.01.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.01.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.01.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.11.2004 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|