Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7149472 | Global Dossier | 12.12.2006 | B2 | US2006148514 | 06.07.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48314603 | 26.06.2003 | US71942603 | 20.11.2003 | US36439606 | 28.02.2006 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2004253118B | Global Dossier | 08.10.2009 | B2 | AU2004253118 | 06.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48314603 | 26.06.2003 | US71942603 | 20.11.2003 | WO2004US18355 | 08.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1636972 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2014 | B1 | EP1636972 | 19.03.2008 | A4 | EP1636972 | 22.03.2006 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US48314603 | 26.06.2003 | US71942603 | 20.11.2003 | WO2004US18355 | 08.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2531036 | 15.10.2013 | C | CA2531036 | 06.01.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48314603 | 26.06.2003 | US71942603 | 20.11.2003 | WO2004US18355 | 08.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1879392B | 03.04.2013 | B | CN1879392 | 13.12.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US48314603 | 26.06.2003 | US71942603 | 20.11.2003 | WO2004US18355 | 08.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1094293 | 23.03.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48314603 | 26.06.2003 | US71942603 | 20.11.2003 | WO2004US18355 | 08.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL172827 | 27.09.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US48314603 | 26.06.2003 | US71942603 | 20.11.2003 | WO2004US18355 | 08.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA06000254 | 30.03.2006 | A | Priority number | Date | US48314603 | 26.06.2003 | US71942603 | 20.11.2003 | WO2004US18355 | 08.06.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ544992 | 27.07.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US48314603 | 26.06.2003 | US71942603 | 20.11.2003 | WO2004US18355 | 08.06.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005002066 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2005 | A3 | WO2005002066 | 06.01.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US48314603 | 26.06.2003 | US71942603 | 20.11.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7043204 | Global Dossier | 09.05.2006 | B2 | US2004266497 | 30.12.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US48314603 | 26.06.2003 | US71942603 | 20.11.2003 |