10.10.2014 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] |
01.07.2014 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
28.03.2014 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.11.2013 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.10.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.10.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.06.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.03.2010 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.11.2009 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
30.10.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.10.2008 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.02.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
21.12.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 23.01.2008 [2008/04] |
13.12.2007 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.10.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.10.2007 |
Change - inventor |
published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] |
27.07.2007 |
First examination report |
|
24.07.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.06.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] |
08.06.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.07.2007 [2007/28] |
27.04.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.04.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.04.2007 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.05.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.04.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.01.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|