EP1805033 - SUBSTRATES COMPRISING ELECTROCONDUCTIVE LAYERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hueck Folien GmbH Gewerbepark 30 4342 Baumgartenberg / AT | [2007/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KASTNER, Friedrich Untersteinbach 17 A-4710 Grieskirchen / AT | 02 /
BERGSMANN, Martin Martinelligang 11 4020 Linz / AT | 03 /
WAGNER, Evelyne Porzellangasse 33A/4/5 A-1090 Wien / AT | [2007/46] |
Former [2007/28] | 01 /
KASTNER, Friedrich Untersteinbach 17 A-4710 Grieskirchen / AT | ||
02 /
BERGSMANN, Martin Steiglandweg 7 A-4060 Leonding / AT | |||
03 /
WAGNER, Evelyne Porzellangasse 33A/4/5 A-1090 Wien / AT | Representative(s) | Landgraf, Elvira, et al Schulfeld 26 4210 Gallneukirchen / AT | [2007/28] | Application number, filing date | 04790663.1 | 20.10.2004 | [2007/28] | WO2004EP11855 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006042568 | Date: | 27.04.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1805033 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B41M3/14, B42D15/00, B42D15/10, D21H21/48, G07D7/00, C08J7/04 | [2007/28] | CPC: |
H05K1/09 (EP,US);
B42D25/29 (EP);
C08J7/043 (EP,US);
C08J7/044 (EP,US);
C08J7/052 (EP,US);
D21H21/48 (EP);
H01B1/127 (EP);
B41M3/14 (EP);
D21H21/42 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUBSTRATE MIT ELEKTRISCH LEITFÄHIGEN SCHICHTEN | [2007/28] | English: | SUBSTRATES COMPRISING ELECTROCONDUCTIVE LAYERS | [2007/28] | French: | SUBSTRATS COMPORTANT DES COUCHES ELECTROCONDUCTRICES | [2007/28] | Entry into regional phase | 10.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 10.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 26.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/46] | 01.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0753623 (MANTEGAZZA A ARTI GRAFICI [IT]) [X] 1* claim 1 *; | [X]DE19915440 (WHD ELEKTRON PRUEFTECH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * claim 1 *; | [X]WO0120691 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1,21,41,56 * claims 1,3,4 * * page 9, line 1 - line 17 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE10111851 (WHD ELEKTRON PRUEFTECH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * claim 1 *; | [X]EP1357226 (HUECK FOLIEN GMBH [AT]) [X] 1-56 * claims 1-57 * * paragraph [0075] * * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0085] *; | [X]WO2004081545 (UNIV GLASGOW [GB], et al) [X] 1,21,41,56 * claims 1,2,6,16 * | by applicant | EP0426801 | WO9966128 | DE10025522 | EP1185422 |