EP1674558 - SLURRY FOR SLICING SILICON INGOT AND METHOD FOR SLICING SILICON INGOT USING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.07.2007 [2007/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/26] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSURUTA, Hirozoh c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-Chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
HAMAYASU, Masayuki; c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-Chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
KAWASAKI, Takafumi; c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-Chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
NISHIDA, Hirokazu; c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-Chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 05 /
TOMINAGA, Hisashi; c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 2-3, Marunouchi 2-Chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2006/26] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/26] | Sajda, Wolf E., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04792274.5 | 12.10.2004 | [2006/26] | WO2004JP15030 | Priority number, date | JP20030356750 | 16.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003356750 | [2006/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005037968 | Date: | 28.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1674558 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 28.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C10M173/02, B24B57/02, B28D5/00, H01L21/304, // C10M173/02, C10N30/06, C10N40/22 | [2006/26] | CPC: |
C09K3/1463 (EP,US);
B28D5/007 (EP,US);
Y02P70/10 (EP,US);
Y10T83/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/04] |
Former [2006/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFSCHLÄMMUNG ZUM SCHNEIDEN VON SILICIUMSTÄBEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM SCHNEIDEN VON SILICIUMSTÄBEN DAMIT | [2006/26] | English: | SLURRY FOR SLICING SILICON INGOT AND METHOD FOR SLICING SILICON INGOT USING SAME | [2006/26] | French: | BOUE POUR DECOUPER DES LINGOTS DE SILICIUM ET PROCEDE DE DECOUPAGE DE LINGOTS DE SILICIUM AU MOYEN DE LADITE BOUE | [2006/26] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2005 | Translation filed | 13.07.2005 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2005 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2005 | Examination requested [2006/26] | 28.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9935220 (NOF CORP [JP], et al); | [X]JP2003082336 (ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KK); | [X]JP2002114970 (ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KK); | [X]JP2003124159 (ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KK) |