EP1695268 - IDENTIFICATION BOOKLET HAVING A RADIO FREQUENCY IDENTIFICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASK S.A. 2260, Route des Crêtes 06560 Valbonne Sophia Antipolis / FR | [2006/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BON, Xavier 300, chemin St Jean de Malte F-13290 Les Milles / FR | [2006/35] | Application number, filing date | 04805586.7 | 30.11.2004 | [2006/35] | WO2004FR03061 | Priority number, date | FR20030014144 | 02.12.2003 Original published format: FR 0314144 | [2006/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005057483 | Date: | 23.06.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1695268 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1695268 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077, B42D15/00 | [2006/35] | CPC: |
B42D25/24 (EP,US);
G06K19/077 (KR);
B42D25/00 (EP,US);
B42D25/305 (US);
G06K19/025 (EP,US);
G06K19/07 (KR);
G06K19/07327 (EP,US);
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
H01Q1/08 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IDENTIFIKATIONSHEFT MIT HOCHFREQUENZ-IDENTIFIKATIONSEINRICHTUNG | [2006/35] | English: | IDENTIFICATION BOOKLET HAVING A RADIO FREQUENCY IDENTIFICATION DEVICE | [2006/35] | French: | LIVRET D'IDENTITE A DISPOSITIF D' IDENTIFICATION RADIOFREQUENCE | [2006/35] | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 29.12.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.06.2007 | CZ | 27.06.2007 | DK | 27.06.2007 | EE | 27.06.2007 | FI | 27.06.2007 | GB | 27.06.2007 | IE | 27.06.2007 | NL | 27.06.2007 | PL | 27.06.2007 | RO | 27.06.2007 | SI | 27.06.2007 | SK | 27.06.2007 | TR | 27.06.2007 | BG | 27.09.2007 | SE | 27.09.2007 | IS | 27.10.2007 | PT | 27.11.2007 | BE | 30.11.2007 | LU | 30.11.2007 | MC | 30.11.2007 | HU | 28.12.2007 | [2017/50] |
Former [2009/44] | CY | 27.06.2007 | |
CZ | 27.06.2007 | ||
DK | 27.06.2007 | ||
EE | 27.06.2007 | ||
FI | 27.06.2007 | ||
GB | 27.06.2007 | ||
IE | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
RO | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
TR | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
IS | 27.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
LU | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
HU | 28.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CY | 27.06.2007 | |
CZ | 27.06.2007 | ||
DK | 27.06.2007 | ||
EE | 27.06.2007 | ||
FI | 27.06.2007 | ||
GB | 27.06.2007 | ||
IE | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
RO | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
IS | 27.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
LU | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
HU | 28.12.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | CY | 27.06.2007 | |
CZ | 27.06.2007 | ||
DK | 27.06.2007 | ||
EE | 27.06.2007 | ||
FI | 27.06.2007 | ||
GB | 27.06.2007 | ||
IE | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
RO | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
IS | 27.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 27.06.2007 | |
DK | 27.06.2007 | ||
EE | 27.06.2007 | ||
FI | 27.06.2007 | ||
GB | 27.06.2007 | ||
IE | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
RO | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
IS | 27.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/43] | CZ | 27.06.2007 | |
DK | 27.06.2007 | ||
GB | 27.06.2007 | ||
IE | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
RO | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
IS | 27.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
BE | 30.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/29] | CZ | 27.06.2007 | |
DK | 27.06.2007 | ||
GB | 27.06.2007 | ||
IE | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
RO | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
IS | 27.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
MC | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/28] | CZ | 27.06.2007 | |
DK | 27.06.2007 | ||
GB | 27.06.2007 | ||
IE | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
RO | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
IS | 27.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/26] | CZ | 27.06.2007 | |
DK | 27.06.2007 | ||
GB | 27.06.2007 | ||
IE | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
IS | 27.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/23] | CZ | 27.06.2007 | |
DK | 27.06.2007 | ||
IE | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
IS | 27.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | CZ | 27.06.2007 | |
IE | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
SK | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
IS | 27.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | CZ | 27.06.2007 | |
IE | 27.06.2007 | ||
NL | 27.06.2007 | ||
PL | 27.06.2007 | ||
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
BG | 27.09.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
IS | 27.10.2007 | ||
PT | 27.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | PL | 27.06.2007 | |
SI | 27.06.2007 | ||
SE | 27.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | PL | 27.06.2007 | |
SE | 27.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5528222 (MOSKOWITZ PAUL A [US], et al) [DA] * column 6, line 58 - line 63; figure 9 *; | [DA]WO0026856 (INTERMEC IP CORP [US]) [DA] * abstract *; | [A]WO0120564 (ORDICAM RECH ET DEV SA [FR], et al) [A] * page 6, line 14 - line 22; figure 4 *; | [A]WO02089052 (ARJO WIGGINS [FR], et al) [A] * figures 1,2; claims 1,10,23,27,28 * |