Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] |
19.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] |
27.02.2009 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.01.2009 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
12.09.2008 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
12.09.2008 | First examination report | |
12.10.2007 | Change: Renewal fee paid | |
12.10.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
12.10.2007 | Change - applicant | published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] |
12.10.2007 | Change - representative | published on 14.11.2007 [2007/46] |
06.04.2007 | Change - representative | published on 09.05.2007 [2007/19] |
23.02.2007 | Change - extension states | published on 28.03.2007 [2007/13] |
20.12.2006 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.09.2006 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.10.2006 [2006/41] |
08.09.2006 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.10.2006 [2006/41] |
31.08.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.08.2006 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
08.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant | |
08.07.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.07.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
11.03.2005 | PCT data prior to European publication |