Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008171969 | Global Dossier | 17.07.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004GB05357 | 20.12.2004 | GB0329269 | 18.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2005261635 | Global Dossier | 24.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004GB05357 | 20.12.2004 | GB0329269 | 18.12.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1708769 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2004GB05357 | 20.12.2004 | GB0329269 | 18.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005058397 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0329269 | 18.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0329269D0 | 21.01.2004 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0329269 | 18.12.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA200605525 | 28.11.2007 | B | Priority number | Date | GB0329269 | 18.12.2003 |