EP1705161 - NEAR INFRARED ABSORBING GREEN GLASS COMPOSITION, AND LAMINATED GLASS USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 5-27, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 5-27, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | ||
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 1-7 Kaigan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8552 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGASHIMA, Yukihito@c/o NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO. LTD. 5-27 Mita 3- chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | 02 /
SETO, Hiromitsu@c/o NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO. LTD. 5-27 Mita 3 chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | 03 /
MURAKAMI, Harunori@c/o NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO. LTD. 5-27 Mita 3 chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | 04 /
TANAKA, Hiroyuki@c/o NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO. LTD. 5-27 Mita 3 chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | [2017/22] |
Former [2017/18] | 01 /
NAGASHIMA, Yukihito.@c/o NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO. LTD. 5-27 Mita 3- chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | ||
02 /
SETO, Hiromitsu@c/o NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO. LID. 5-27 Mita 3 chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | |||
03 /
MURAKAMI, Harunori@c/o NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO.LTD. 5-27 Mita 3 chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | |||
04 /
TANAKA, Hiroyuki@c/o NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO. LTD. 5-27 Mita 3 chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | |||
Former [2008/28] | 01 /
NAGASHIMA, Y. c/o NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO. LTD. 5-27 Mita 3- chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | ||
02 /
SETO, Hiromitsu c/o NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO. LID. 5-27 Mita 3 chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | |||
03 /
MURAKAMI, Harunori c/o NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO.LTD. 5-27 Mita 3 chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | |||
04 /
TANAKA, Hiroyuki c/o NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO. LTD. 5-27 Mita 3 chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | |||
Former [2006/39] | 01 /
NAGASHIMA, Y. c/o NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO. LTD. 1-7, Kaigan 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8552 / JP | ||
02 /
SETO, Hiromitsu c/o NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO. LID. 1-7, Kaigan 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8552 / JP | |||
03 /
MURAKAMI, Harunori c/o NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO.LTD. 1-7, Kaigan 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8552 / JP | |||
04 /
TANAKA, Hiroyuki c/o NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO. LTD. 1-7, Kaigan 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8552 / JP | Representative(s) | Hart-Davis, Jason Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2017/22] |
Former [2006/39] | Hart Davis, Jason Cabinet Beau de Loménie, 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 04807725.9 | 24.12.2004 | [2006/39] | WO2004JP19368 | Priority number, date | JP20030435284 | 26.12.2003 Original published format: JP 2003435284 | [2006/39] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005063643 | Date: | 14.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1705161 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1705161 | Date: | 31.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C03C4/08, C03C3/095, C03C3/089, C03C3/091, C03C3/087, C03C27/12, C03C4/02 | [2016/51] | CPC: |
C03C3/095 (EP,US);
B32B17/10036 (EP);
B32B17/1011 (EP);
B32B17/10761 (EP);
C03C3/091 (EP,US);
C03C4/02 (EP,US);
C03C4/082 (EP,US);
Y10T428/269 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31616 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31627 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/39] | C03C4/08, C03C3/095, C03C3/089, C03C3/091, C03C3/087, C03C27/12 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/22] |
Former [2006/40] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2006/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | IM NAHINFRAROT ABSORBIERENDE GRÜNGLASZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERBUNDGLAS DAMIT | [2006/39] | English: | NEAR INFRARED ABSORBING GREEN GLASS COMPOSITION, AND LAMINATED GLASS USING THE SAME | [2006/39] | French: | COMPOSITION DE VERRE VERT ABSORBANT L'INFRAROUGE PROCHE ET VERRE FEUILLETE COMPRENANT CETTE DERNIERE | [2006/39] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2006 | Translation filed | 13.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2006 | Search fee paid | 13.07.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2006 | Examination requested [2006/39] | 16.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 11.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.04.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 21.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 04.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 03.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2006 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.01.2007 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH10297934 ; | [X]JPH04310539 ; | [XY]US5214008 (BECKWITH STEVEN P [US], et al) [X] 1,2,18-20,23,25-29 * column 8, lines 21-34 * [Y] 21,22; | [Y]US5372977 (MAZON-RAMOS PEDRO [ES], et al) [Y] 24* column 4, lines 56-59; example 7 *; | [X]WO9628394 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,16,18-20 * page 6, line 7; examples 1,2 *; | [XY]US5817587 (JEANVOINE PIERRE [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,6,18-20,23,25-29 * example 1; claim 2 * [Y] 14,15; | [X]EP0887320 (GLAVERBEL [BE]) [X] 1,2,6,18-20,23,25-29 * page 7, line 41; examples 10,15,18-29,35,45,47; tables I,II *; | [XY]US5897956 (KIJIMA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,8,9,12,13,18-20,23,25-29 * column 9, lines 34,35; examples 1-3,7; claims 1,2 * * column 6, lines 55-65 * [Y] 14,15,21,22,24; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1999, no. 04, Database accession no. 1999-040512, XP002542855 & JPH10297934 A 19981110 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5,7,18-20,23,25-29 * abstract * * paragraph [0001]; examples 1,2; table 1 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1992, no. 50, Database accession no. 1992-412409, XP002542918 & JPH04310539 A 19921102 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1-5,7-11,18-20,23,25-29 * abstract * * examples 1-3 * | International search | [X]JPH10297934 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD); | [X]JPH09208254 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD); | [X]JPH10265239 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD) | Examination | US5077133 | WO0125160 | US2002198094 |