EP1723536 - RATE COMPUTATIONS OF PARTICULAR USE IN SCHEDULING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.12.2018 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.07.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134-1706 / US | [2017/50] |
Former [2006/47] | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. Patent Prosecution, c/o Robert Barr, 170 West Tasman Drive, MS SJC 10/2/1 San Jose, CA 95134 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COHEN, Earl, T. 43750 Cameron Hills Drive Fremont, CA 94539 / US | 02 /
KAPPLER, Christopher, J. 18 Cedarcroft Lane Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [2006/47] | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/07] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2006/47] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04815421.5 | 23.12.2004 | [2006/47] | WO2004US43343 | Priority number, date | US20040777607 | 11.02.2004 Original published format: US 777607 | [2006/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005081729 | Date: | 09.09.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/36] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1723536 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1723536 | Date: | 14.02.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.06.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/16, H04L12/801, H04L12/815, H04L12/819, H04L12/873 | [2017/31] | CPC: |
H04L47/10 (EP,US);
H04L47/215 (EP,US);
H04L47/22 (EP,US);
H04L47/527 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/12] | G06F15/16, H04L12/56 | ||
Former IPC [2006/47] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/07] |
Former [2006/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | RATENBERECHNUNGEN ZUR SENDEZEITPLANUNG | [2017/31] | English: | RATE COMPUTATIONS OF PARTICULAR USE IN SCHEDULING | [2006/47] | French: | CALCUL DES TAUX D'UTILISATIONS PARTICULIERES A DES FINS DE PROGRAMMATION | [2006/47] |
Former [2006/47] | RATENBERECHNUNGEN FÜR BESTIMMTE BENUTZUNG BEI DER EINTEILUNG | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2006 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/47] | 18.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.11.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 15.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.12.2004 | AT | 14.02.2018 | CY | 14.02.2018 | CZ | 14.02.2018 | DK | 14.02.2018 | EE | 14.02.2018 | ES | 14.02.2018 | FI | 14.02.2018 | IT | 14.02.2018 | LT | 14.02.2018 | MC | 14.02.2018 | NL | 14.02.2018 | PL | 14.02.2018 | PT | 14.02.2018 | RO | 14.02.2018 | SE | 14.02.2018 | SI | 14.02.2018 | SK | 14.02.2018 | TR | 14.02.2018 | BG | 14.05.2018 | GR | 15.05.2018 | IS | 14.06.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 23.12.2004 | |
AT | 14.02.2018 | ||
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PT | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
TR | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
MC | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SI | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
DK | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
CZ | 14.02.2018 | ||
EE | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
PL | 14.02.2018 | ||
RO | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
SK | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
IT | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
SE | 14.02.2018 | ||
BG | 14.05.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 14.02.2018 | |
CY | 14.02.2018 | ||
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
GR | 15.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
ES | 14.02.2018 | ||
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 14.02.2018 | |
FI | 14.02.2018 | ||
LT | 14.02.2018 | ||
NL | 14.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO0038471 (NORTEL NETWORKS CORP [CA]) [X] 1,6,22 * page 4 - page 5 * * page 9, line 21 - page 10, line 10 * * figure 2 * [A] 2-5,7-21; | [X]US2002138643 (SHIN KANG G [US], et al) [X] 1-10,22 * paragraphs [0028] , [0039] , [0047] * * paragraphs [0119] - [0127] *; | [A]US2003076848 (BREMLER-BARR ANAT [IL], et al) [A] 1-10,22 * abstract ** paragraphs [0121] - [0150] * | International search | [YE]US2005063388 (STACEY DAVE [GB], et al); | [YE]US2005220114 (ROMANO DAVID [US], et al) | by applicant | WO0038471 | US2002138643 |