Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
11.05.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.06.2007 [2007/24] |
24.01.2007 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
01.12.2006 | Definitive list of designations | published on 03.01.2007 [2007/01] |
14.04.2006 | Request for examination filed | published on 31.05.2006 [2006/22] |
10.03.2006 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 26.04.2006 [2006/17] |