EP1649808 - Blood sugar level measuring apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.06.2007 [2007/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cho, Ok-Kyung c/o Hitachi Ltd. New Marunouchi Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi, 1 Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | 02 /
Kim, Yoon-Ok c/o Hitachi Ltd. New Marunouchi Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi, 1 Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | 03 /
Maruoka, Kurazo c/o Hitachi Ltd. New Marunouchi Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi, 1 Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | 04 /
Mitsumaki, Hiroshi c/o Hitachi Ltd. New Marunouchi Bldg. 6-1, Marunouchi, 1 Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [2006/17] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2006/17] | Application number, filing date | 05001045.3 | 19.01.2005 | [2006/17] | Priority number, date | JP20040304794 | 19.10.2004 Original published format: JP 2004304794 | [2006/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1649808 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/145, A61B5/00 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
A61B5/01 (EP,US);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/01] |
Former [2006/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Blutzuckermessgerät | [2006/17] | English: | Blood sugar level measuring apparatus | [2006/17] | French: | Appareil de mesure du taux de sucre sanguin | [2006/17] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 08.05.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0128414 (KAUFMANN KIM YUN OAK [DE], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 1 - page 20 *; | [A]US6269314 (IITAWAKI TOMOKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3* figure 2 *; | [A]US2003010898 (MACKENZIE HUGH ALEXANDER [GB], et al) [A] 1-3 * paragraph [0078]; figure 5 *; | [X] - OK KYUNG CHO ET AL, "NONINVASIVE MEASUREMENT OF GLUCOSE BY METABOLIC HEAT CONFORMATION METHOD", CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CLINICAL CHEMISTRY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20040812), vol. 50, no. 10, ISSN 0009-9147, pages 1894 - 1898, XP001209544 [X] 1-7 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1373/clinchem.2004.036954 |