EP1598121 - Laser-based stripping method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2019 | Change - classification | published on 13.02.2019 [2019/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Deutschland GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2005/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Engler, Harald Hoher Weg 7 27733 Delmenhorst / DE | 02 /
Hönemann, Lothar-Bernhard Ohserstrasse 1 28279 Bremen / DE | 03 /
Dörr, Tillmann Bossdorfstrasse 7 28201 Bremen / DE | [2005/47] | Representative(s) | LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf Patentanwalt Attorney at Law PartG mbB Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/47] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof, Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05002293.8 | 03.02.2005 | [2005/47] | Priority number, date | DE20041025017 | 18.05.2004 Original published format: DE102004025017 | US20040600063P | 09.08.2004 Original published format: US 600063 P | [2005/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1598121 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/47] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1598121 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B08B7/00, B23K26/14 | [2005/47] | CPC: |
B08B7/0042 (EP,US);
B23K26/361 (EP,US);
B23K26/40 (EP,US);
B23K2101/35 (EP,US);
B23K2103/10 (EP,US);
B23K2103/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2007/42] |
Former [2005/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lasergestütztes Entschichtungsverfahren | [2005/47] | English: | Laser-based stripping method | [2005/47] | French: | Procédé de décapage par laser | [2005/47] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2005 | Examination requested [2005/47] | 15.08.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.10.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 30.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.07.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/01] | 24.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.09.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO8301400 (FIRST OF CHELSEA CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,5-10,12-14 * abstract * * page 1, lines 2-5 * * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 3 * * page 6, lines 17-22 * * page 7, lines 29-34 * * page 9, line 12 - page 10, line 10 * * claim 5 * * figure - *; | [A]US5662762 (RANALLI RONALD J [US]) [A] 1,2,4-10,12,14 * abstract * * column 1, lines 5-7 * * column 1, lines 21-24 * * column 1, lines 30-36 * * column 2, lines 5-10 * * column 2, lines 23-25 * * column 3, lines 40-45 * * column 3, lines 39-42 * * column 3, line 66 - column 4, line 3 ** figure - *; | [X]US5986234 (MATTHEWS DENNIS L [US], et al) [X] 1-10,12-14 * abstract * * column 1, lines 11-28 * * column 2, lines 5-13 * * column 2, line 50 - column 3, line 3 * * column 3, lines 7-13 * * column 3, lines 36-44 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 9 * * figure 1 *; | [X]DE10113494 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,9-12 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0020] * * figure - * | Examination | US4756765 | US2004035498 | by applicant | GB334985 | WO8301400 | JPH07321448 | US5662762 | US5986234 | DE10113494 |