EP1721644 - A portable wireless control apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2008 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 09.07.2008 [2008/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Chainpus Technology Co., Ltd. No. 2-5, Shanzibian Danshui Town Tapei County / TW | [2006/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wu, Wen-An No. 2-5, Shanzibian Danshui Town Taipei County / TW | [2006/46] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/28] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/46] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Postfach 22 14 43 80504 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05008802.0 | 21.04.2005 | [2006/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1721644 | Date: | 15.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/06 | [2006/46] | CPC: |
A63F13/332 (EP);
A63F13/235 (EP,US);
A63F13/24 (EP,US);
A63F13/92 (EP,US);
A63F2300/1031 (EP);
A63F2300/1043 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2007/29] |
Former [2006/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Eine tragbare schnurlose Steuerungsvorrichtung | [2006/46] | English: | A portable wireless control apparatus | [2006/46] | French: | Appareil de contrôle portable avec connection sans-fil | [2006/46] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/09] | 12.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/09] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 21.06.2007 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 21.06.2007 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.06.2007 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE20022523U (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1-10 * page 2, lines 10-32 * * page 4, line 36 - page 5, line 10 * * page 5, lines 19-27; figures 2-6 * * page 6, lines 11-37 * * page 7, lines 15-18 * * page 7, lines 20-23 *; | [A]WO03054672 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al) [A] 1,5,8,10 * page 2, lines 6-26 ** page 8, lines 34-37; figure 3e *; | [A]US2003186746 (CHUANG TSUNG-JEN [TW]) [A] 1,9,10 * paragraph [0032]; figures 4a,4b *; | [Y]EP1380324 (SONY ERICSSON MOBILE COMM AB [SE]) [Y] 1-10 * paragraphs [0031] - [0036]; figures 2-4 * * paragraphs [0037] , [0038]; figure 7 * * paragraphs [0041] , [0042]; figure 9 * |