Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1602473 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2009 | B1 | EP1602473 | 07.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004026969 | 02.06.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE426504T | 15.04.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004026969 | 02.06.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102004026969 | 29.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004026969 | 02.06.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502005006923D1 | 07.05.2009 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004026969 | 02.06.2004 |