EP1731617 - Fermentative preparation of riboflavin involving recycling of lysed biomass as nutrient medium [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.03.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 16.09.2009 [2009/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [2009/38] |
Former [2006/50] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Representative(s) | Schwander, Kuno DSM Nutritional Products Ltd. Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | Schwander, Kuno DSM Nutritional Products Ltd., Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | Application number, filing date | 05012131.8 | 06.06.2005 | [2006/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1731617 | Date: | 13.12.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12P25/00 | [2006/50] | CPC: |
C12P25/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Rückführung lysierter Biomasse als Nährmedium bei der fermentativen Herstellung von Riboflavin | [2006/50] | English: | Fermentative preparation of riboflavin involving recycling of lysed biomass as nutrient medium | [2006/50] | French: | Recyclage d'une biomasse lysée comme milieu nutritif dans la préparation fermentative de la riboflavine. | [2006/50] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/17] | 07.12.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: A.91(5) [2007/17] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE2431002 (SQUIBB & SONS INC) [X] 1,2,4,8,11 * the whole document * * siehe insbesondere:; page 3, line 3 - line 5 * * page 10; example 3 * [A] 3,5-7,9,10,12-14; | [XY]DE2920592 (MERCK & CO INC) [X] 1-4,8,11-13 * the whole document * * siehe insbesondere:; page 5, line 13 - line 29 * * page 6, line 14 - line 23 * * page 9; example 4 * [Y] 5,6; | [YA]EP0487985 (BASF AG [DE]) [Y] 5,6 * the whole document * * siehe insbesondere:; page 5 - page 7; example 5; table 5 * [A] 1-4,7-14; | [DA]EP0821063 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [DA] 1-14* the whole document *; | [XA] - PAYOT, T. ET AL., "Lactic acid production by Bacillus coagulans - Kinetic studies and optimization of culture medium for batch and continuous fermentations", ENZYME AND MICROBIAL TECHNOLOGY, (19990215), vol. 24, no. 3/4, pages 191 - 199, XP002240545 [X] 1,4,11 * the whole document * [A] 2,3,5-10,12-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0141-0229(98)00098-2 |