19.11.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] |
20.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] |
06.08.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] |
16.07.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.08.2010 [2010/33] |
02.10.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] |
04.09.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.10.2009 [2009/41] |
08.05.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2009 [2009/24] |
24.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] |
03.04.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.05.2009 [2009/19] |
23.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] |
16.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] |
16.01.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] |
09.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] |
26.12.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.01.2009 [2009/05] |
28.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.12.2008 [2009/01] |
21.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.12.2008 [2008/52] |
13.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] |
12.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] |
10.10.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] |
26.09.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.10.2008 [2008/44] |
19.09.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] |
22.08.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] |
08.02.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.03.2008 [2008/11] |
29.01.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
29.01.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.11.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.08.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
22.06.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.06.2007 |
First examination report |
|
21.06.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
15.12.2006 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] |
29.09.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.11.2006 [2006/44] |
24.03.2006 |
Publication of search report |
published on 10.05.2006 [2006/19] |
25.11.2005 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 11.01.2006 [2006/02] |