EP1614596 - Control device for a windscreen wipe and wash installation on a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GM Global Technology Operations, Inc. 300 Renaissance Center Detroit, MI 48265-3000 / US | [2006/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jung, Frank Vor der Höhe 13 63225 Langen / DE | [2006/02] | Representative(s) | Daniel, Ulrich W.P. Adam Opel AG, Patent- und Markenrecht A0-02 65423 Rüsselsheim / DE | [2006/02] | Application number, filing date | 05013629.0 | 24.06.2005 | [2006/02] | Priority number, date | DE20041033505 | 10.07.2004 Original published format: DE102004033505 | [2006/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1614596 | Date: | 11.01.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1614596 | Date: | 10.05.2006 | [2006/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1614596 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/48, B60R16/00 | [2006/02] | CPC: |
B60S1/482 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/02] | Title | German: | Steuerungseinrichtung für eine Scheibenwisch- und-waschanlage an einem Kraftfahrzeug | [2006/02] | English: | Control device for a windscreen wipe and wash installation on a vehicle | [2006/02] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle d'une installation de lavage et d'essuyage de vitres sur un véhicule | [2006/02] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/44] | 25.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.12.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 12.03.2008 | CZ | 12.03.2008 | DK | 12.03.2008 | EE | 12.03.2008 | FI | 12.03.2008 | IE | 12.03.2008 | LT | 12.03.2008 | NL | 12.03.2008 | PL | 12.03.2008 | RO | 12.03.2008 | SI | 12.03.2008 | SK | 12.03.2008 | TR | 12.03.2008 | BG | 12.06.2008 | SE | 12.06.2008 | GR | 13.06.2008 | AT | 24.06.2008 | LU | 24.06.2008 | BE | 30.06.2008 | MC | 30.06.2008 | IS | 12.07.2008 | PT | 18.08.2008 | HU | 13.09.2008 | [2010/51] |
Former [2010/38] | CY | 12.03.2008 | |
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
TR | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
AT | 24.06.2008 | ||
LU | 24.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
HU | 13.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/36] | CY | 12.03.2008 | |
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
AT | 24.06.2008 | ||
LU | 24.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
HU | 13.09.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 12.03.2008 | |
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
AT | 24.06.2008 | ||
LU | 24.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/41] | CY | 12.03.2008 | |
CZ | 12.03.2008 | ||
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
AT | 24.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
BG | 12.06.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
EE | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
BE | 30.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
DK | 12.03.2008 | ||
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
IE | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
MC | 30.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
IS | 12.07.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/52] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
NL | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | CZ | 12.03.2008 | |
FI | 12.03.2008 | ||
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
RO | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SK | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
PT | 18.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | FI | 12.03.2008 | |
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
SE | 12.06.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | FI | 12.03.2008 | |
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
SI | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/43] | FI | 12.03.2008 | |
LT | 12.03.2008 | ||
PL | 12.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/39] | FI | 12.03.2008 | |
LT | 12.03.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4317073 (BLASZKOWSKI HENRY) [A] 1,8* the whole document *; | [A]DE4027326 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US5105134 (SHIMIZU HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,8 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 6; figure - *; | [XA]DE4241056 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 8 * the whole document * [A] 1 | by applicant | DE2123376 | DE4016772 |