EP1787627 - Anti-microbial dental impression material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2010 | Change - representative | published on 15.09.2010 [2010/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2007/21] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center, 2501 Hudson Road St. Paul, Minnesota 55144-1000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klettke, Thomas, Dr. Graf-Berchtold-Str. 1a 86911 Diessen / DE | 02 /
Kappler, Oliver, Dr. Oderdinger Strasse 17a 82362 Weilheim / DE | 03 /
Haeberlein, Ingo, Dr. Oderdinger Strasse 23b 82362 Weilheim / DE | [2007/21] | Representative(s) | Fiesser, Gerold Michael, et al Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | Fiesser, Gerold Michael, et al Herzog Fiesser & Partner Isartorplatz 8 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/21] | Fiesser, Gerold Michael, et al KNH Patentanwälte, Kahlhöfer, Neumann, Herzog, Fiesser, Isartorplatz 8 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05025182.6 | 17.11.2005 | [2007/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1787627 | Date: | 23.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/10, // A61L2/00 | [2007/21] | CPC: |
A61L2/16 (EP,US);
A61K6/90 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2008/05] |
Former [2007/21] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Antimikrobielles Zahnabdruckmaterial | [2007/21] | English: | Anti-microbial dental impression material | [2007/21] | French: | Materiau d`empreinte dentaire antimicrobien | [2007/21] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/24] | 28.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2007 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6559199 (PUSINERI CHRISTIAN [FR], et al) [X] 1-3,5-15 * examples 1-6 * [Y] 4; | [YA]WO2005077321 (KETTENBACH GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) [Y] 4 * page 42, paragraph L - page 43, paragraph 2; examples 9b,9d,9e; table 4 * [A] 1-15; | [AD] - FLANAGAN D A ET AL, "Antimicrobial activities of dental impression materials.", DENTAL MATERIALS : OFFICIAL PUBLICATION OF THE ACADEMY OF DENTAL MATERIALS. NOV 1998, (199811), vol. 14, no. 6, ISSN 0109-5641, pages 399 - 404, XP002391901 [AD] 1-15 * abstract * * page 399, column 2, paragraph 4 - page 400, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0300-5712(99)00013-5 | [A] - DEL PILAR RIOS MARIA ET AL, "Effects of chemical disinfectant solutions on the stability and accuracy of the dental impression complex", THE JOURNAL OF PROSTHETIC DENTISTRY, (199610), vol. 76, no. 4, ISSN 0022-3913, pages 356 - 362, XP002391902 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 357, column 2, paragraph 1 * * page 358, column 2, paragraph 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-3913(96)90538-7 |