Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
04.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] |
10.01.2007 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
24.10.2006 | New entry: Period of grace R.85a / R.108(3) EPC1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
24.10.2006 | New entry: Period of grace R.85b EPC 1973: despatch of communication + time limit | |
20.10.2006 | Definitive list of designations | published on 22.11.2006 [2006/47] |
27.01.2006 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.03.2006 [2006/11] |