EP1635191 - Device for controlling the speed of a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.05.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.05.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zimmermann, Uwe Im Hof 6 71686 Remseck / DE | 02 /
Pruksch, Achim Buchenweg 1 74861 Neudenau / DE | [2006/11] | Application number, filing date | 05107116.5 | 02.08.2005 | [2006/11] | Priority number, date | DE20041043358 | 08.09.2004 Original published format: DE102004043358 | [2006/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1635191 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/93, B60K31/00, B60T7/12 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
G01S13/931 (EP);
B60W30/16 (EP);
G01S2013/93185 (EP);
G01S2013/9319 (EP);
G01S2013/9321 (EP);
G01S2013/9323 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2006/47] |
Former [2006/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Regelung der Geschwindigkeit eines Fahrzeugs | [2006/11] | English: | Device for controlling the speed of a vehicle | [2006/11] | French: | Dispositif d'asservissement de la vitesse d'un véhicule | [2006/11] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/23] | 16.01.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/23] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 30.10.2006 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2006 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2006 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 30.10.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.10.2006 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000258524 ; | [XY]US5283622 (UENO HIROSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,8,9 * column 3, lines 33-35 * * column 4, line 43 - column 5, line 2; figure 3 * * column 6, lines 23-51; figure 5 * [Y] 7; | [Y]EP0758093 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4-7,9 * column 2, lines 23-34; figure 1 * * column 3, lines 32-40 * * column 4, line 52 - column 6, line 18; figures 8,9A,9B *; | [Y]US5712640 (ANDOU HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-7,9 * figure 2 *; | [Y]DE19935123 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-3,5,6,9 * column 5, line 46 - column 6, line 45; figures 5A,5B,6 *; | [XY]WO0054070 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5,8,9 * page 1, lines 8-11,22-27 * * page 3, line 4 - page 5, line 14; figure 1 * [Y] 7; | [YD]DE19934670 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [YD] 1-7,9 * column 4, lines 20-41 * * column 6, line 50 - column 11, line 16; figures 1,2,4,5 *; | [XY]US6246502 (OKADA TOHRU [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,9 * column 8, line 29 - column 9, line 3; figures 12,13 * * column 10, lines 27-36 * * column 10, line 56 - column 11, line 18; figure 16 * [Y] 7; | [Y]EP1324068 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-6,9 * paragraphs [0003] , [0005]; figure 9 *; | [Y]DE10244205 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4-7,9 * paragraphs [0014] - [0025]; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE10261027 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6,9 * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] , [0025]; figures 3,6-8 *; | [XP]EP1522869 (VALEO SCHALTER & SENSOREN GMBH [DE]) [XP] 1-4,6,9 * paragraphs [0018] , [0043] - [0050]; figure 4 * * column 1, lines 26-28 * * column 6, lines 15-19 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010103), vol. 2000, no. 12, & JP2000258524 A 20000922 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1,2,5,6,9 * abstract * | by applicant | DE19934670 |