EP1632404 - Imminent-collision detection system and process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Autoliv ASP, Inc. 3350 Airport Road Ogden, Utah 84405 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/51] | For all designated states AUTOLIV ASP, INC. 3350 Airport Road Ogden, Utah 84405 / US | ||
Former [2006/10] | For all designated states M/A-COM, INC. 1011 Pawtucket Boulevard Lowell, MA 01853 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Paradie, Michael John 10 Bible Way Nashua, NH New Hampshire 03063 / US | [2006/10] | Representative(s) | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron Warren Redfern 1000 Great West Road Brentford TW8 9DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/10] | Johnstone, Douglas Ian, et al Baron & Warren, 19 South End, Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 05107287.4 | 08.08.2005 | [2006/10] | Priority number, date | US20040914360 | 09.08.2004 Original published format: US 914360 | [2006/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1632404 | Date: | 08.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1632404 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/0134, G01S13/93 | [2007/47] | CPC: |
G06T7/70 (EP,US);
G06V20/58 (EP,US);
B60R21/0134 (EP,US);
G01S5/16 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/10] | B60R21/01, G01S13/93 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2006/46] |
Former [2006/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Feststellung einer bevorstehenden Kollision | [2006/10] | English: | Imminent-collision detection system and process | [2006/10] | French: | Dispositif et procédé de détection d'une collision imminente | [2006/10] | Examination procedure | 29.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/41] | 09.09.2006 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 16.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.11.2006 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | BG   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | CZ   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | EE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | HU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | IS   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | LT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | LV   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | PL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | RO   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | SI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | SK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.11.2006 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5572428 (ISHIDA SHINNOSUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * column 2, line 2 - column 3, line 43; figure - *; | [A]US5613039 (WANG C DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1-23* column 3, line 36 - column 5, line 41; figure - *; | [A]EP1273930 (FORD GLOBAL TECH INC [US]) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0021]; figure - *; | [A]US2003139883 (TAKAFUJI TETSUYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-23 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0017]; figure -; claim - *; | [X]WO03096068 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [X] 1-23 * page 1 - page 4 * * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 4 * * page 13, paragraph 2; figure - * |