EP1667104 - A system and method for driving an LCD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.05.2009 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toppoly Optoelectronics Corp. 12, Ke Jung Road, Science-Based Industrial Pk. Chu-Nan 350 Miao-Li County / TW | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sano, Keiichi 4F, No. 122, Sec. 7 Jhongshan N. Rd., Shihlin District 111 Taipei City, Taiwan / TW | 02 /
Lee, Szu-Hsien No. 16, Lane 95 Jiouru 1st Rd., Sanmin District 807 Kaohsiung City, Taiwan / TW | 03 /
Oku, Norio 6F, No. 66, Lane 405, Sec. 6 Jhongshan N. Rd., Shihlin District 111 Taipei City, Taiwan / TW | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | 2K Patentanwälte Blasberg Kewitz & Reichel Partnerschaft mbB Schumannstrasse 27 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Patentanwälte Kewitz & Kollegen Kewitz & Kollegen Partnerschaft Corneliusstrasse 18 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2006/23] | Patentanwälte Kewitz & Kollegen Corneliusstrasse 18 60325 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 05111660.6 | 02.12.2005 | [2006/23] | Priority number, date | US20040633048P | 03.12.2004 Original published format: US 633048 P | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1667104 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1667104 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | [2008/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/36 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
G09G3/3614 (EP,US);
G09G3/3648 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0297 (EP,US);
G09G2330/021 (EP,US);
G09G3/3685 (EP,US);
G09G5/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/10] |
Former [2006/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur LCD-Ansteuerung | [2006/23] | English: | A system and method for driving an LCD | [2006/23] | French: | Système et procédé de commande d'un écran à cristaux liquides | [2006/23] | Examination procedure | 29.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/27] | 02.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2008 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2001249650 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB) [Y] 4,14* figure 10 *; | [XY]US2003085885 (NAKAYOSHI YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraph [0095]; figures 1,2,5,6 * [Y] 4,14 |