EP1674231 - Improved system for forming products from elastomeric material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gitis S.r.L. Via Colombara del Bosco 26 25031 Capriolo BS / IT | [2006/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parzani, Dr. Luigi Via Rocca, 4 24067, SARNICO (Bergamo) / IT | [2006/26] | Representative(s) | Ripamonti, Enrico, et al Giambrocono & C. S.p.A., Via Rosolino Pilo, 19/B 20129 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/26] | Ripamonti, Enrico, et al Giambrocono & C. s.p.a., 19/B, Via Rosolino Pilo 20129 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 05112509.4 | 20.12.2005 | [2006/26] | Priority number, date | IT2004MI02480 | 23.12.2004 Original published format: IT MI20042480 | [2006/26] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1674231 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1674231 | Date: | 13.01.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/02, B29C45/27 | [2006/26] | CPC: |
B29C45/02 (EP);
B29C2045/2796 (EP);
B29C45/27 (EP);
B29C45/322 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/26] | Extension states | AL | 18.12.2006 | BA | 18.12.2006 | HR | 18.12.2006 | MK | 18.12.2006 | YU | 18.12.2006 | Title | German: | Verbessertes System zum Formen von Produkten aus elastomerem Material | [2006/26] | English: | Improved system for forming products from elastomeric material | [2006/26] | French: | Système amélioré pour former des produits en matière élastomère | [2006/26] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/05] | 07.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 13.01.2010 | CY | 13.01.2010 | DK | 13.01.2010 | EE | 13.01.2010 | FI | 13.01.2010 | LT | 13.01.2010 | LV | 13.01.2010 | SK | 13.01.2010 | BG | 13.04.2010 | GR | 14.04.2010 | IS | 13.05.2010 | PT | 13.05.2010 | HU | 14.07.2010 | [2012/42] |
Former [2011/07] | BE | 13.01.2010 | |
CY | 13.01.2010 | ||
DK | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
LT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LV | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
BG | 13.04.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
IS | 13.05.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | BE | 13.01.2010 | |
CY | 13.01.2010 | ||
EE | 13.01.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2010 | ||
LT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LV | 13.01.2010 | ||
SK | 13.01.2010 | ||
BG | 13.04.2010 | ||
GR | 14.04.2010 | ||
IS | 13.05.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | FI | 13.01.2010 | |
LT | 13.01.2010 | ||
LV | 13.01.2010 | ||
IS | 13.05.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/38] | FI | 13.01.2010 | |
LT | 13.01.2010 | ||
IS | 13.05.2010 | ||
PT | 13.05.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3590114 (UHLIG ALBERT R) [A] 1 * figures 5-8 *; | [A]GB1352348 (MANNESMANN MEER AG) [A] 1* page 2, line 117 - page 3, line 32 *; | [X]US3843295 (GREENBERG W, et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE2401009 (CLOUTH GUMMIWERKE AG) [A] 1 * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 5, paragraph 1 *; | [A]US3973892 (REES HERBERT) [A] 1 * figure 3 *; | [A]GB1511847 (TAYLOR D) [A] 1 * page 6, line 123 - page 7, line 97 *; | [A]GB2218372 (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US5200208 (COHEN ZACHARIHA [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 9, line 15 - line 38 * |