EP1635315 - Image display unit and method of driving the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.09.2013 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.10.2013 [2013/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/11] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meguro, Takeya, Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6 chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Motoe, Hisafumi, Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6 chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Yamamoto, Yosuke, Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6 chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Ikeda, Hiroyuki, Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6 chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/11] | Representative(s) | Haines, Miles John L.S., et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | Haines, Miles John L.S., et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2006/11] | Leppard, Andrew John D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 05255374.0 | 02.09.2005 | [2006/11] | Priority number, date | JP20040258162 | 06.09.2004 Original published format: JP 2004258162 | JP20050179912 | 20.06.2005 Original published format: JP 2005179912 | [2006/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1635315 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1635315 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | [2007/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G09G3/22 | [2006/11] | CPC: |
G09G3/22 (EP,KR,US);
G09G3/20 (KR);
G09G3/006 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0267 (EP,US);
G09G2320/0233 (EP,US);
G09G2320/046 (EP,US);
G09G2330/028 (EP,US);
G09G2330/12 (EP,US);
G09G3/2011 (EP,US);
G09G5/006 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/14] |
Former [2006/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildanzeigegerät und Ansteuerverfahren dafür | [2006/11] | English: | Image display unit and method of driving the same | [2006/11] | French: | Dispositif d'afffichage d'image et sa méthode de commande | [2006/11] | Examination procedure | 02.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 26.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/41] | 24.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.05.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0487742 (SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]) [X] 1-5,7,8 * column 1, line 37 - column 1, line 57 * * column 2, line 6 - column 2, line 19 * * column 6, line 46 - column 6, line 50 * * column 7, line 43 - column 8, line 3 * * column 12, line 31 - column 12, line 47 * * column 16, line 6 - column 16, line 25 * * figure 1 * * figure 2 *; | [A]WO0070595 (COLORADO MICRODISPLAY INC [US]) [A] 1,7,8 * page 14 * * page 15 * * page 17 *; | [A]US2002075248 (MORITA KEIZO [JP], et al) [A] 1,2 * page 2, paragraph 31 ** page 5, paragraph 79 - page 5, paragraph 80 * |