EP1686189 - Detection of polynucleotides on nucleic acid arrays using azido-modified triphosphate nucleotide analogs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.10.2007 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.10.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Affymetrix, Inc. 3380 Central Expressway Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | [2006/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barone, Anthony D. 2118 Ellen Avenue San Jose, CA 95125 / US | 02 /
Li, Handong 1352 Petal Way San Jose, CA 95129 / US | 03 /
McGall, Glenn H. 769 Oregon Avenue Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | [2006/31] | Representative(s) | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al Avidity IP Broers Building Hauser Forum 21 J J Thomson Ave Cambridge CB3 0FA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | Bizley, Richard Edward, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05258108.9 | 29.12.2005 | [2006/31] | Priority number, date | US20040640387P | 30.12.2004 Original published format: US 640387 P | [2006/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1686189 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1686189 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C07H21/00 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6816 (EP,US);
C12N15/1096 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6806 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6837 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/158 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C12Q1/6806, C12Q2525/143, C12Q2525/117 (US,EP);
C12Q1/6816, C12Q2525/113, C12Q2565/501 (EP,US);
C12Q1/6837, C12Q2525/113, C12Q2521/107 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/31] | Title | German: | Benutzung von azido-modifizierten triphosphat nukleotid Analoge für den Nachweis von Polynukleotiden auf Nukleinsäure Arrays | [2006/31] | English: | Detection of polynucleotides on nucleic acid arrays using azido-modified triphosphate nucleotide analogs | [2006/31] | French: | Utilisation de nucléotide triphosphates modifiées avec azide dans la détection de polynucléotides sur matrice d'acides nucléiques | [2006/31] | Examination procedure | 10.02.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2007/48] | 15.06.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2007/48] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9727317 (AFFYMETRIX INC [US], et al) [A] * figure 1 *; | [XY]WO9853103 (CLONTECH LAB INC [US], et al) [X] 1-6,16,18-23,25-28 * page 137, paragraph 2 - page 143; claim - * [Y] 7-15,17,24; | [Y] - WANG CHARLES C -Y ET AL, "Site-specific fluorescent labeling of DNA using Staudinger ligation.", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (2003), vol. 14, no. 3, ISSN 1043-1802, pages 697 - 701, XP002387639 [Y] 7-9,13-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - SEO TAE SEOK ET AL, "Click chemistry to construct fluorescent oligonucleotides for DNA sequencing.", JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (20030124), vol. 68, no. 2, ISSN 0022-3263, pages 609 - 612, XP002387640 [Y] 7,10,11,24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo026615r | [Y] - WADA TAKESHI ET AL, "Synthesis and properties of 2-azidodeoxyadenosine and its incorporation into oligodeoxynucleotides", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (20011224), vol. 42, no. 52, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 9215 - 9219, XP002387641 [Y] 12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(01)02028-7 | [DY] - PADILLA ET AL, NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (2002), vol. 30, no. 24, page E138, XP002387642 [DY] 17 * the whole document * |